McCall v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Melissa M. McCall
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00659
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f): Initial pretrial conference set for 1/22/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Malone, Robbie)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Robbie Malone added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.(Malone, Robbie)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa M. McCall. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Davidson, Joseph)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (am)
November 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Scott Davidson on behalf of Melissa M. McCall (Davidson, Joseph)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Melissa M. McCall. (Davidson, Joseph)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12849026), filed by Melissa M. McCall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Represented By: Jin Seock Shin
Represented By: Robbie Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa M. McCall
Represented By: Mohammed O. Badwan
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?