Eakin v. U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Rosalie Eakin
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association and PHH Mortgage The Resulting Company By Way of Merger With Ocwen
Case Number: 6:2019cv00669
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Respond to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Plaintiff shall file her response to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support (ECF No. 4) on or before January 6, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Rosalie Eakin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Helstowski, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by PHH Mortgage The Resulting Company By Way of Merger With Ocwen, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for an Expedited Order, #2 Exhibit B - Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Response, #4 Exhibit D - Order Allowing Foreclosure, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Hayes, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by PHH Mortgage The Resulting Company By Way of Merger With Ocwen, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association. (Hayes, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PHH Mortgage The Resulting Company By Way of Merger With Ocwen, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association. (Hayes, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage The Resulting Company By Way of Merger With Ocwen, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12864365), filed by PHH Mortgage The Resulting Company By Way of Merger With Ocwen, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit B - Bell CAD Property Search)(Hayes, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eakin v. U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage The Resulting Company By Way of Merger With Ocwen
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Eakin
Represented By: John Gannon Helstowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?