Abrams et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: Jose Abrams and Lucinda Abrams
Defendant: Dr. Jeffrey J. Jaindl, Baylor Scott & White Health, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and U. S. Radiology On-Call LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00232
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f), The Court shall hold a Rule 16(b) initial pretrial conference on Wednesday, July 15, 2020, at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
May 19, 2020 Filing 23 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Jeffrey J. Jaindl and U. S. Radiology On-Call LLC. (am)
May 19, 2020 Filing 22 DEFENDANTS U.S. RADIOLOGY ON-CALL LLC AND JEFFREY J. JAINDL, D.O.S ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney William H. Chamblee added to party Jeffrey J. Jaindl(pty:dft), Attorney William H. Chamblee added to party U. S. Radiology On-Call LLC(pty:dft) by Jeffrey J. Jaindl, U. S. Radiology On-Call LLC.(Chamblee, William)
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucinda Abrams, Jose Abrams. All Plaintiffs. (Brown, Laura)
May 5, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey J. Jaindl, Spartanburg, SC address. (lad)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 Issued in error. Re-issuing. Summons Issued as to All Plaintiffs. (am) Modified on 5/5/2020 (lad).
May 5, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jose Abrams, Lucinda Abrams. (Brown, Laura)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f), Telephone Conference set for 6/17/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 Defendants Scott & White Memorial Hospital d/b/a Baylor Scott & White Medical Center Temple and Scott & White Clinic's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Nathan I. Cox added to party Baylor Scott & White Health(pty:dft) by Baylor Scott & White Health.(Cox, Nathan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 Proof of delivery of Summons by Lucinda Abrams as to J. Jaindl, Santa Monica Address. CMRR dated 4/17/2020. (Brown, Laura) Modified on 5/4/2020 (bw).
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 Proof of delivery of Summons by Lucinda Abrams as to Gary M. Manuele. CMRR dated 4/3/20 (Brown, Laura) Modified on 4/16/2020 (lad).
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey J. Jaindl, Santa Monica address. (lad)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jose Abrams, Lucinda Abrams. (Brown, Laura)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 Proof of delivery of Summons by Lucinda Abrams as to U.S. Atty General. CMRR dated 3/31/20 (Brown, Laura) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lad).
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 Proof of delivery of Summons by Lucinda Abrams as to U.S. Attorney's Office. CMRR dated 3/30/20 (Brown, Laura) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lad).
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Proof of delivery of Summons by Lucinda Abrams as to U.S. Radiology On-Call LLC. CMRR dated 3/30/20 (Brown, Laura) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lad).
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Proof of delivery of Summons by Lucinda Abrams as to Baylor Scott & White. CMRR dated 4/1/20 (Brown, Laura) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lad).
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey J. Jaindl. (lad)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U. S. Radiology On-Call LLC. (lad)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baylor Scott & White Health. (lad)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and Dept of the Army (lad)
March 26, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jose Abrams, Lucinda Abrams. (Brown, Laura)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13391910), filed by Lucinda Abrams, Jose Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Laura)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Amended Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19, #2 Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19)(mc5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jeffrey J. Jaindl
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Ryan
Represented By: William H. Chamblee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Scott & White Health
Represented By: Nathan I. Cox
Represented By: Stanley Alan Thiebaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Radiology On-Call LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Ryan
Represented By: William H. Chamblee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Abrams
Represented By: Michael E.J. Archuleta
Represented By: Dale Douglas Williams
Represented By: Laura E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Abrams
Represented By: Michael E.J. Archuleta
Represented By: Dale Douglas Williams
Represented By: Laura E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?