SITO Mobile R&D IP et al v. FloSports, Inc.
Plaintiff: SITO Mobile R&D IP and SITO Mobile, Ltd.
Counter Plaintiff: FloSports, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00471
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CANCELLING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above entitled and numbered case having been set for TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE on Friday, September 18, 2020 at 03:30 PM is hereby CANCELLED until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 9/18/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RESETTING, Telephone Conference set for 9/18/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd..(Mort, Raymond)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE, Telephone Conference set for 9/3/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FloSports, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Brian K. Erickson added to party FloSports, Inc.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by FloSports, Inc..(Erickson, Brian)
August 3, 2020 Reset Deadlines: FloSports, Inc. answer due 8/10/2020. (am)
August 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Parties' Joint Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including August 10, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
July 6, 2020 Reset Deadlines: FloSports, Inc. answer due 7/31/2020. (am)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including July 31, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. FloSports, Inc. served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Mort, Raymond)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13671386) by on behalf of SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13671374) by on behalf of SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13671360) by on behalf of SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13671351) by on behalf of SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FloSports, Inc. (lad)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Mort, Raymond)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13623822), filed by SITO Mobile R&D IP, SITO Mobile, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SITO Mobile R&D IP et al v. FloSports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: FloSports, Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SITO Mobile R&D IP
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: Ronald M. Daignault
Represented By: Stephanie R Mandir
Represented By: Jason S. Charkow
Represented By: Chandran B. Iyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SITO Mobile, Ltd.
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: Ronald M. Daignault
Represented By: Stephanie R Mandir
Represented By: Jason S. Charkow
Represented By: Chandran B. Iyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?