Spam Blocker LLC v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Spam Blocker LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00513
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spam Blocker LLC as to LG Electronics Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/7/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Griffin, Ryan)
July 2, 2020 Reset Deadlines: LG Electronics Inc. answer due 10/5/2020; LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 10/5/2020. (am)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Parties' Agreed Motion to extend the time for Defendant to Answer. The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 5, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Spam Blocker LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, Ryan)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spam Blocker LLC. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Griffin, Ryan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (am)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Inc.. (am)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Spam Blocker LLC. (Griffin, Ryan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Spam Blocker LLC. (Griffin, Ryan)
June 10, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Griffin, Ryan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/10/2020) (am).
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13650710), filed by Spam Blocker LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claim Chart (US9749469), #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart (US9497321), #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart (US9338292), #4 Exhibit D - Claim Chart (US9167088), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spam Blocker LLC v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spam Blocker LLC
Represented By: Ryan Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?