Teleputers, LLC v. Fujitsu America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teleputers, LLC
Defendant: Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited, Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc. and Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00640
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fujitsu America, Inc. answer due 9/23/2020; Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc. answer due 9/23/2020; Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc. answer due 9/23/2020; Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc. answer due 9/23/2020. (bw)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 23, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc., Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc., Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Dawn)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Satchwell for Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc., Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited, Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Matthew Satchwell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13849056) by on behalf of Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc., Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited, Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall T. Garteiser on behalf of Teleputers, LLC. Attorney Randall T. Garteiser added to party Teleputers, LLC(pty:pla) (Garteiser, Randall)
August 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fujitsu America, Inc. answer due 9/7/2020; Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc. answer due 9/7/2020; Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc. answer due 9/7/2020; Fujitsu Limited answer due 9/7/2020; Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc. answer due 9/7/2020. (mc5)
August 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants' Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have up to and including September 7, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc., Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited, Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Fujitsu Limited. (bw)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc.. (bw)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc.. (bw)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc.. (bw)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fujitsu America, Inc.. (bw)
July 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fasone, Thomas)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Teleputers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Fasone, Thomas) (All Documents replaced to flatten documents as required).
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13763693), filed by Teleputers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US6952478, #2 Exhibit B - US7092526, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fasone, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teleputers, LLC v. Fujitsu America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Satchwell
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Frontech North America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Satchwell
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Limited
Represented By: Matthew Satchwell
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Satchwell
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Satchwell
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teleputers, LLC
Represented By: M. Scott Fuller
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: Thomas G. Fasone, III
Represented By: Randall T. Garteiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?