Arden Innovations LLC v. The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation
Plaintiff: Arden Innovations LLC
Defendant: The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation doing business as Discount Tire
Case Number: 6:2020cv00645
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Reset Answer Deadlines: The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation answer due 10/12/2020. (bw)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendant has until on or before October 12, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Second Request) by The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaCorte, Brian)
August 11, 2020 Reset Answer Deadlines: The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation answer due 9/10/2020. (bw)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 10, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (LaCorte, Brian)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaCorte, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arden Innovations LLC. The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Griffin, Ryan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 600026979) by The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Proposed Order)(bw)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (bw)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Arden Innovations LLC. (Griffin, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arden Innovations LLC. (Griffin, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Griffin, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13767685). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Arden Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claim Chart (US8001465), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arden Innovations LLC v. The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation doing business as Discount Tire
Represented By: Brian W. LaCorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arden Innovations LLC
Represented By: Ryan Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?