Triller, Inc. v. ByteDance Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Triller, Inc.
Defendant: ByteDance Ltd. and TikTok, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00693
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1).Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant ByteDance Ltd.'s Motion to Allow Melissa R. Smith (Ms. Smith) to Withdraw As Counsel. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Ms. Smith is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Ms. Smith has withdrawn as counsel for Defendant and that she no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ByteDance Ltd., TikTok, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 14, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Proshanto Mukherji ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13962399) by on behalf of ByteDance Ltd., TikTok, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Frank E. Scherkenbach ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13962383) by on behalf of ByteDance Ltd., TikTok, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Adam J. Kessel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13962325) by on behalf of ByteDance Ltd., TikTok, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of ByteDance Ltd., TikTok, Inc.. Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party ByteDance Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party TikTok, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hoffman, David)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including November 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 19, 2020 Reset Deadlines: TikTok, Inc. answer due 11/16/2020. (am)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by TikTok, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of ByteDance Ltd., TikTok, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party TikTok, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Triller, Inc. as to ByteDance Ltd. Waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Hill, Jack) Modified on 8/18/2020 (lad).
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Triller, Inc.. TikTok, Inc. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Hill, Jack)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Triller, Inc.. ByteDance Ltd. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Hill, Jack)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill of Brent P. Lorimer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13823794) by on behalf of Triller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill of Brian N. Platt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13823738) by on behalf of Triller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to TikTok, Inc.. (am)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ByteDance Ltd.. (am)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian N Platt for Triller, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brent P. Lorimer for Triller, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Triller, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Triller, Inc. (Fair, Andrea)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Triller, Inc. (Everingham, Charles)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Triller, Inc.. (am)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Triller, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Triller, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13808912). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Triller, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Hill, Jack)
July 29, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triller, Inc. v. ByteDance Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Ltd.
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triller, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Andrea L. Fair
Represented By: Frank E. Scherkenbach
Represented By: Adam J. Kessel
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?