Lewis v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Henry Michael Lewis
Defendant: D Cockeral, R Clarke, Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis and N Sandifer
Case Number: 6:2020cv00710
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Case Transferred Letter. (Attachments: #1 Privacy Policy)(am)
August 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Texas; Case Number 6:20-cv-00405.
August 3, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Texas Waco Division. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/4/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The above-styled civil action is TRANSFERRED forthwith to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Waco Division, for such other and further proceedings as that court may deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/03/20. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/4/2020.]
July 24, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/4/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/4/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Henry Michael Lewis. (Attachments: #1 IFP Data Sheet)(mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/4/2020.]
July 24, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Henry Michael Lewis. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/4/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R Clarke, D Cockeral, Lorie Davis, N Sandifer, filed by Henry Michael Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Grievance Step 1, #3 Exhibit Grievance Step 2, #4 Envelope(s))(mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/4/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Cockeral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Sandifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?