Zamanov v. KYZ Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Niyaz Naib Zamanov
Defendant: Sedikie Kamara, KYZ Logistics, LLC and DOK Freight Systems, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00711
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Referral Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Letter to DOK Freight Systems, LLC, KYZ Logistics, LLC, Sedikie Kamara. (am)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Niyaz Naib Zamanov. (am)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of Texas; Case Number 4:20-cv-01924.
August 4, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to Western Distict of Texas, Waco Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 08/04/2020, filed. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Western District of Texas, Waco Division. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting #2 Defendants KYZ Logistics, LLC, DOK Freight Systems, LLC, and Sedikie Kamara's MOTION to Transfer Venue. The case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Waco Division. Defendants' Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement (Doc. No. 4) remains for adjudication. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas, Waco Division, filed by DOK Freight Systems, LLC, KYZ Logistics, LLC, Sedikie Kamara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Antonmattei-Goitia, Sadi) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 20, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Niyaz Naib Zamanov. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bertini, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 20, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas, Waco Division filed by Niyaz Naib Zamanov. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bertini, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 20, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Niyaz Naib Zamanov, filed.(Bertini, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of attorney substitution by Niyaz Naib Zamanov. Attorney Christopher D. Bertini added. Attorney Husein Hadimohammadabadi terminated, filed. (Higdon, Paul) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by DOK Freight Systems, LLC, KYZ Logistics, LLC, Sedikie Kamara, filed.(Antonmattei-Goitia, Sadi) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement by DOK Freight Systems, LLC, KYZ Logistics, LLC, Sedikie Kamara, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Antonmattei-Goitia, Sadi)[Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas, Waco Division by DOK Freight Systems, LLC, KYZ Logistics, LLC, Sedikie Kamara, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit Crash Report, #3 Exhibit Wikipedia Page, #4 Exhibit Google Earth Map, #5 Exhibit Motion to Transfer Venue in State Court, #6 Proposed Order)(Antonmattei-Goitia, Sadi) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-28346 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24737611) filed by Sedikie Kamara, DOK Freight Systems, LLC, KYZ Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition, #4 Exhibit DOK Service of Process, #5 Exhibit KYZ Service of Process, #6 Exhibit Counsel of Record, #7 Exhibit Motion to Transfer Venue in State Court, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Antonmattei-Goitia, Sadi) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamanov v. KYZ Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedikie Kamara
Represented By: Sadi Rafael Antonmattei-Goitia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYZ Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Sadi Rafael Antonmattei-Goitia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOK Freight Systems, LLC
Represented By: Sadi Rafael Antonmattei-Goitia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niyaz Naib Zamanov
Represented By: Paul A. Higdon
Represented By: Husein Hadimohammadabadi
Represented By: Christopher David Bertini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?