Law Office of Ryan Downton v. Little River Healthcare Holdings, LLC et al
Appellant: Law Office of Ryan Downton
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Appellee: Little River Healthcare Holdings, LLC, Compass Pointe Holdings, LLC, Little River Healthcare Management, LLC, Cantera Way Ventures, LLC, Rockdale Backhawk, LLC, Timberlands Healthcare, LLC, King's Daughters Pharmacy, LLC and Little River Healthcare Physicians, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00715
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Law Office of Ryan Downton, re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Appeal filed by Appellant Law Office of Ryan Downton (Downton, Ryan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Law Office of Ryan Downton, re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Appeal filed by Appellant Law Office of Ryan Downton (Behrens, Eric)
September 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Appeal by Law Office of Ryan Downton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Downton, Ryan)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 10/5/2020. (bw)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT to #5 -- Supplemental Transmission of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The Appellant's Supplemental Designation of the Record on Appeal is Complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Supplemental Designation, #2 Supplemental Designated Item BK Dkt # 973, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Hardage, Bridget)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellee's Designated Record on Appeal is Complete. Filed (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation, #2 Designated Items A - D, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Hardage, Bridget)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellant's designated Record on Appeal is Complete. Filed (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation, #2 Appellant's Designated Items 1.a-e, g-l, n-p, #3 Appellant's Designated Item 1.f Judgment AP 20-6006, #4 Appellant's Designated Item 1.m AP 20-6007 AnsCrsClm, #5 Appellant's Designated Item 2.a 04/16/2019 Transcript, #6 Appellant's Designated Item 2.b 07/07/2020 Transcript, #7 Appellant's Designated Item 2.c 07/28/2020 Transcript, #8 Appellant's Designated Item 3.a-b, #9 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Hardage, Bridget)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Unredacted Briefing, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Downton Declaration and Exhibits, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Downton, Ryan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to District Court of Cross Appeal Filed by Brian Talbot Cumings for Trustee James Studensky. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 Cross Appeal List of Parties) (Lawson, Rob)
August 10, 2020 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5)
August 5, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #2 List of Parties, #3 LtrTrnNtcDCBK) (tr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law Office of Ryan Downton v. Little River Healthcare Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Law Office of Ryan Downton
Represented By: Bradley Dalton Coburn
Represented By: Ryan Downton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Represented By: Shane Patrick Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Little River Healthcare Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Morris Dean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Compass Pointe Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Morris Dean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Little River Healthcare Management, LLC
Represented By: Morris Dean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cantera Way Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Morris Dean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rockdale Backhawk, LLC
Represented By: Morris Dean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timberlands Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Morris Dean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: King's Daughters Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Morris Dean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Little River Healthcare Physicians, LLC
Represented By: Morris Dean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?