Chang, et al v. Agricultural Bank of China Ltd.
Plaintiff: Baochong B Chang and Hailloo Precise Manufactory, Inc.
Defendant: Agricultural Bank of China Ltd
Case Number: 6:2020cv00744
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Santosh Aravind for Genevieve Hanft ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13969854) by on behalf of Agricultural Bank of China Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Aravind, Santosh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Santosh Aravind for Christopher B. Harwood ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13969806) by on behalf of Agricultural Bank of China Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Aravind, Santosh) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/15/2020) (am). Modified on 9/15/2020 (am).
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Agricultural Bank of China Ltd for Christopher Harwood and Genevieve Hanft. (am)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 APPENDIX to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Agricultural Bank of China Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Santosh Aravind)(Aravind, Santosh)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by Agricultural Bank of China Ltd. (Aravind, Santosh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Baochong B Chang. (am)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baochong B Chang. Agricultural Bank of China Ltd served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (am)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Agricultural Bank of China Ltd. (bw)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Baochong B Chang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chang, et al v. Agricultural Bank of China Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baochong B Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailloo Precise Manufactory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agricultural Bank of China Ltd
Represented By: Santosh Aravind
Represented By: Genevieve Hanft
Represented By: Christopher B. Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?