Richman Technology Corporation v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Richman Technology Corporation
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00769
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases
September 17, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Google LLC answer due 11/2/2020. (bw)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. BEFORE THE COURT is the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Google LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond (the Unopposed Motion). The Court has considered the Unopposed Motion and finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Google LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended untilNovember 2, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige)
August 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Richman Technology Corporation. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Richman Technology Corporation. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Richman Technology Corporation (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13894534), filed by Richman Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richman Technology Corporation v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richman Technology Corporation
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Bijal V. Vakil
Represented By: Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?