Estech Systems, Inc. v. Howard Midstream Energy Partners
Plaintiff: Estech Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Howard Midstream Energy Partners doing business as Howard Energy Partners
Counter Plaintiff: Howard Midstream Energy Partners
Case Number: 6:2020cv00777
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Howard Midstream Energy Partners. (Qureshi, Wasif)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Estech Systems, Inc. by Howard Midstream Energy Partners.(Qureshi, Wasif)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases
August 30, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Howard Midstream Energy Partners answer due 10/19/2020. (lad)
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 19, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Howard Midstream Energy Partners. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Qureshi, Wasif)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wasif Qureshi on behalf of Howard Midstream Energy Partners. Attorney Wasif Qureshi added to party Howard Midstream Energy Partners(pty:dft) (Qureshi, Wasif) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/28/2020) (am).
August 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Howard Midstream Energy Partners. (lad)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Todd E. Landis. (lad)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to John Wittenzellner. (lad)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Estech Systems, Inc.. to Howard Midstream Energy Partners d/b/a Howard Energy Partners (Williams, Fred)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Estech Systems, Inc.. (Williams, Fred)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13897084), filed by Estech Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estech Systems, Inc. v. Howard Midstream Energy Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Midstream Energy Partners doing business as Howard Energy Partners
Represented By: Wasif Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estech Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Hardt
Represented By: Michael Simons
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Represented By: Fred I. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Howard Midstream Energy Partners
Represented By: Wasif Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?