Solas OLED Ltd. v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Solas OLED Ltd.
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc., LG Electronics Inc., Sony Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Sony Electronics Inc. and LG Display Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00839
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Reset Deadlines: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 11/23/2020; Sony Electronics Inc. answer due 11/23/2020. (am)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Defendants LG Electronics USA, Inc. and Sony Electronics Inc. After consideration, the Court GRANTS the Motion. It is SO ORDERED that time is extended for Defendants LG Electronics USA, Inc. and Sony Electronics Inc. to respond to the complaint to November 23, 2020.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solas OLED Ltd.. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Solas OLED Ltd.. Sony Electronics Inc. served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Mirzaie, Reza) Modified answer due date on 9/23/2020 (lad).
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Sony Electronics Inc.. (lad)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Sony Corporation. (lad)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (lad)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Inc.. (lad)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to LG Display Co., Ltd.. (lad)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LG Display America, Inc.. (lad)
September 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Solas OLED Ltd. re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13970303), filed by Solas OLED Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solas OLED Ltd. v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solas OLED Ltd.
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Philip X. Wang
Represented By: Paul A. Kroeger
Represented By: Kent N. Shum
Represented By: Jonathan Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?