Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Combs et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Jarrett B. Haynes a/k/a Jay and d/b/a One Shot Sports Bar, Suk Ja Combs d/b/a One Shot Sports Bar, Jarrett B. Haynes doing business as One Shot Sports Bar also known as Jay, Suk Ja Combs doing business as One Shot Sports Bar and Jay
Case Number: 6:2020cv00858
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SUK JA COMBS, d/b/a ONE SHOT SPORTS BAR andJARRETT B. HAYNES, a/k/a JAY and d/b/a ONE SHOT SPORTS BAR (lad)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order Entry of Default). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (King, Jamie)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Jarrett B. Haynes served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (King, Jamie)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Suk Ja Combs served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (King, Jamie)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jarrett B. Haynes. (lad)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Suk Ja Combs. (lad)
September 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13985300), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Combs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrett B. Haynes a/k/a Jay and d/b/a One Shot Sports Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suk Ja Combs d/b/a One Shot Sports Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrett B. Haynes doing business as One Shot Sports Bar also known as Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suk Ja Combs doing business as One Shot Sports Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?