Milestone IP LLC v. BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Milestone IP LLC
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00884
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Storm, Paul)
October 26, 2020 Reset Deadlines: BMO Harris Bank N.A. answer due 11/23/2020. (am)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including November 23, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (proposed Order Granting Motion) by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Thomas, J.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Thomas, J.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Michael Thomas on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Attorney J. Michael Thomas added to party BMO Harris Bank N.A.(pty:dft) (Thomas, J.)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14025932) by on behalf of Milestone IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
September 29, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (am)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Milestone IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Milestone IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14016474), filed by Milestone IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milestone IP LLC v. BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milestone IP LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: Franklin D. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Paul V. Storm
Represented By: J. Michael Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?