WSOU Investments LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development and WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Technologies USA Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00889
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matthew Koide on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Koide, Brian)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Thompson, G.)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Mann, J.)
October 19, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Huawei Technologies USA Inc. answer due 1/5/2021. (am)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including January 5, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Cook, Jason) Modified on 10/16/2020 (am).
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason W. Cook on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. Attorney Jason W. Cook added to party Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason W. Cook added to party Huawei Technologies USA Inc.(pty:dft) (Cook, Jason)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (am)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (am)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WSOU Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for summons)(Etheridge, James)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Siegmund on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Mark D. Siegmund added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Siegmund, Mark)
October 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Huang added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Huang, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Mangrum, Brett)
October 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Richins, Travis)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Etheridge, James)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James)
September 30, 2020 Document Civil Cover Sheet was not flattened. Please notice that all documents are REQUIRED to be flattened upon filing. The US Clerk's Office will flatten any document needed prior but all parties MUST flatten documents going forward. Contact the Clerk's Office for any questions. (bw)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Form) (bw)
September 30, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14018503). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US6704304, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/30/2020) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WSOU Investments LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Tyler T. VanHoutan
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Jason W. Cook
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies USA Inc.
Represented By: Tyler T. VanHoutan
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Jason W. Cook
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development
Represented By: James L. Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Represented By: James L. Etheridge
Represented By: Jeffrey Huang
Represented By: Mark D. Siegmund
Represented By: Travis Lee Richins
Represented By: Brian Matthew Koide
Represented By: Brett Aaron Mangrum
Represented By: Ryan Scott Loveless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?