WSOU Investments LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development and WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Defendant: Huawei Technologies USA Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00917
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matthew Koide on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brian Matthew Koide added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Koide, Brian)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Thompson, G.)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Mark Mann on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Mann, J.)
October 28, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Huawei Technologies USA Inc. answer due 1/5/2021. (lad)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.s (Huawei USA)Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Huawei USA seeks an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Having considered the Motion, the Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be and hereby is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Huawei USA to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including January 5, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
October 16, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. answer due 1/5/2021. (am)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. as to Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. Waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Cook, Jason) Modified on 10/16/2020 (am).
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason W. Cook on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. Attorney Jason W. Cook added to party Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason W. Cook added to party Huawei Technologies USA Inc.(pty:dft) (Cook, Jason)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Huang added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Huang, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Mangrum, Brett)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Richins, Travis)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (am)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. (am)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WSOU Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for summons)(Etheridge, James)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Siegmund on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Mark D. Siegmund added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Siegmund, Mark)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC. (Etheridge, James)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Form) (bw)
October 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14032559). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7423962, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WSOU Investments LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies USA Inc.
Represented By: Tyler T. VanHoutan
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Jason W. Cook
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Tyler T. VanHoutan
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Jason W. Cook
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development
Represented By: James L. Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Represented By: James L. Etheridge
Represented By: Jeffrey Huang
Represented By: Mark D. Siegmund
Represented By: Travis Lee Richins
Represented By: Brian Matthew Koide
Represented By: Brett Aaron Mangrum
Represented By: Ryan Scott Loveless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?