Baughman v. Wainwright et al
Plaintiff: Steven Kurt Baughman
Defendant: Dale Wainwright, Rachell West, Christopher Johnson, Shannon Shannon, Jessica Gaston and Michael A Buchanan
Case Number: 6:2020cv00993
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 Case Transfer and Case Opening Letter. (am)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Waco Division of the Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 Case Transfer and Opening Letter mailed to Steven Kurt Baughman. (cj)
October 20, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steven Kurt Baughman. (cj)
October 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane.. Referral Judge: Mark Lane. (cj)
October 20, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of Texas; Case Number 4:20-cv-03590.
October 20, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 10/20/2020, filed. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dale Wainwright, Christopher Johnson, Shannon Shannon, Jessica Gaston, Rachell West, and Michael A. Buchanan, filed by Steven Kurt Baughman. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven Kurt Baughman, filed. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Steven Kurt Baughman, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2020. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baughman v. Wainwright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachell West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kurt Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?