Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Sonim Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Sonim Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01047
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Sonim Technologies, Inc. answer due 1/21/2021. (lad)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. THE COURT, having considered Plaintiff Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. and Defendant Sonim Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Extension, HEREBY ORDERS that Defendant Sonim's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including January 21, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sonim Technologies, Inc.. (lad)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14178349), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness In Patent Cases v2. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Sonim Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonim Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?