LedComm LLC v. Signify North America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: LedComm LLC
Defendant: Signify N.V., Signify North America Corporation and Signify Holding B.V.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01056
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cole B. Richter for LedComm LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jae Y. Pak for LedComm LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Grosby for LedComm LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for Cole B. Richter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286800) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad).
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for Jae Y. Pak ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286795) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad).
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for David R. Grosby ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14286785) on behalf of LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond) Modified on 12/15/2020 (lad).
December 14, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Signify Holding B.V., Signify N.V. and Signify North America Corporation answer due 3/10/2021. (lad)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendants' First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff LedComm, LLC's Complaint is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to March 10, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Signify Holding B.V., Signify N.V., Signify North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Cox, Brady)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Signify North America Corporation. (lad)
November 16, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LedComm LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14188429), filed by LedComm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LedComm LLC v. Signify North America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LedComm LLC
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Represented By: Jae Y. Pak
Represented By: David R. Grosby
Represented By: Cole B. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signify N.V.
Represented By: Brady Randall Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signify North America Corporation
Represented By: Brady Randall Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signify Holding B.V.
Represented By: Brady Randall Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?