DATREC, LLC v. eMDs, Inc.
Plaintiff: DATREC, LLC
Counter Plaintiff: eMDs, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01057
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Letter to J. Aron Carnahan (lad)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 eMDs, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against DATREC, LLC by eMDs, Inc..(Rudman, Jody)
December 15, 2020 Reset Deadlines: eMDs, Inc. answer due 1/8/2021. (am)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendant eMDs, Inc. is granted an additional thirty (30) days to answer, file motion(s) or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement and shall file such on or before January 8, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eMDs, Inc.. (Rudman, Jody)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or File Motion(s) by eMDs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rudman, Jody)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DATREC, LLC. eMDs, Inc. served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Ramey, William)
November 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to eMDs, Inc.. (lad)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DATREC, LLC. (Ramey, William)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120, FLATTEN, and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (lad)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14191794), filed by DATREC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Standing Order Regarding Notice to Patent Trademark Office v2. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DATREC, LLC v. eMDs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: eMDs, Inc.
Represented By: Jody Lynn Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DATREC, LLC
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?