Coldiron Specialized Company v. Norton Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Coldiron Specialized Company
Defendant: Norton Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01062
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip L. Free, Jr on behalf of Coldiron Specialized Company (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Free, Phillip) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/18/2020) (lad).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coldiron Specialized Company. (Atchley, Michael)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael L. Atchley, II for Phillip L. Free, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14200602) by on behalf of Coldiron Specialized Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Atchley, Michael)
November 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Norton Transport, Inc.. (am)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Atchley, Michael)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Coldiron Specialized Company. (Atchley, Michael)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coldiron Specialized Company. (Atchley, Michael)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14193534), filed by Coldiron Specialized Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Atchley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coldiron Specialized Company v. Norton Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coldiron Specialized Company
Represented By: Michael L. Atchley, II
Represented By: Phillip L. Free, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norton Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?