WSOU Investments LLC v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01165
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Huang added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Huang, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matthew Koide on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brian Matthew Koide added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Koide, Brian)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC. Attorney Brett Aaron Mangrum added to party WSOU Investments LLC(pty:pla) (Mangrum, Brett)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Siegmund on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Siegmund, Mark)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Richins, Travis)
December 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of WSOU Investments LLC (Loveless, Ryan)
December 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Etheridge, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Etheridge, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14302542). No Summons requested at this time, filed by WSOU Investments LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WSOU Investments LLC v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Represented By: James L. Etheridge
Represented By: Ryan Scott Loveless
Represented By: Travis Lee Richins
Represented By: Brett Aaron Mangrum
Represented By: Jeffrey Huang
Represented By: Mark D. Siegmund
Represented By: Brian Matthew Koide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?