Latinos for Trump v. Sessions Featured Case
Plaintiff: Latinos for Trump, J.J., B.G., J.B., Joshua Macias, M.S. and Blacks for Trump
Defendant: Pete Sessions, Mitch McConnell, All Secretaries of State, Mark Zuckerberg, Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez, All Members of the 117th U.S. Congress, Chuck Schumer, Nancy Pelosi, Brad Raffensperger and All State Governors
Case Number: 6:2021cv00043
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Paul Davis, re 19 MOTION extension of time for the purpose of acquiring new counsel filed by Plaintiff B.G. MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AS SANCTIONS IN RESPONSE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Paul)
February 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION extension of time for the purpose of acquiring new counsel by B.G. and notice to the court that Paul Davis is no longer the atty of record. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
February 19, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Ashley Hoff. (am)
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H.H., J.B., J.J., P.P., R.D. (Davis, Paul)
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Latinos for Trump, Blacks for Trump, Joshua Macias, B.G., and M.S. by A.B., A.L., A.P., B.G., Blacks for Trump, C.H., C.S., E.R., E.R.(2), H.D., H.H., I.M., J.B., J.G., J.J., Latinos for Trump, M.B., M.S., M.T., Joshua Macias, P.P., R.C., R.D., R.R., T.L.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
February 18, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by B.G., Blacks for Trump, J.B., J.J., Latinos for Trump, M.S., Joshua Macias. to U.S. Attorney Ashley C. Hoff (Davis, Paul)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants amending 12 Amended Complaint,., filed by Blacks for Trump, J.J., B.G., Joshua Macias, Latinos for Trump, M.S., J.B.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Paul)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to 11 Order to Show Cause by B.G., Blacks for Trump, J.B., J.J., Latinos for Trump, M.S., Joshua Macias. (Davis, Paul)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint and Application for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants amending, filed by Blacks for Trump, J.J., B.G., Joshua Macias, Latinos for Trump, M.S., J.B.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Paul)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2021. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support, filed by Latinos for Trump, re 6 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Oral Hearing Requested filed by Plaintiff Latinos for Trump Alternative Proposed TRO Submitted (less drastic remedy) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Alternate Proposed TRO, # 2 Exhibit A - Tweets & Article of Roger Sollenberger, # 3 Exhibit B - Original Tweet of Roger Sollenberger, # 4 Exhibit C - Letter from Anne Champion, # 5 Exhibit D - Tweet of Anne Champion, # 6 Exhibit E - Report: Failure to Preserve Data)(Davis, Paul)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to 6 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Oral Hearing Requested "THE DEMOCRACY PLAYBOOK: Preventing and Reversing Democratic Backsliding" by The Brookings Institute, November 2019 - Exhibit to Expert Report of J.S. Vanderbol III (cited in footnote 13) by Latinos for Trump. (Davis, Paul)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DECLARATION OF PAUL M. DAVIS by Latinos for Trump (Davis, Paul)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of AMENDED PROPOSED FORM OF TRO by Latinos for Trump re 6 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Oral Hearing Requested (Davis, Paul)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Oral Hearing Requested by Latinos for Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Global Risk Analysis: Special Report:, # 2 Exhibit B - CV of J.S. Vanderbol III, # 3 Exhibit C - Full Text of HAVA with Highlights, # 4 Exhibit D - Second Declaration of Joshua Macias, # 5 Exhibit E - Virginia Voter Registrationa Application, # 6 Exhibit F - Expressvote Screenshot, # 7 Exhibit G - Declaration of J.J., # 8 Exhibit H - Ballotopedia, Voting in Alabama, # 9 Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Davis, Paul)
January 20, 2021 Text Order GRANTING 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency Request for Oral Hearing and Entry of Alternate Temporary Restraining Order by Latinos for Trump. (Davis, Paul)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul M. Davis for Kellye SorElle ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14391047) by on behalf of Latinos for Trump. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
January 19, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Referral Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (am)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental List of Defendants Who Are Members of Congress by Latinos for Trump re #1 Complaint,,, (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Defendants who are Members of Congress)(Davis, Paul)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Latinos for Trump. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joshua Macias, #2 Exhibit Expert Report of Steve Vanderbol, #3 Exhibit CV of Steve Vanderbol, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Davis, Paul)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14386818). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Latinos for Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of State Governors and Secretaries of State, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cain Declaration 20210118, #3 Exhibit 3 - Global Risk Analysis: Special Report, #4 Exhibit 4-1, #5 Exhibit 4-2, #6 Exhibit 4-3, #7 Exhibit 4-4, #8 Exhibit 4-5, #9 Exhibit 4-6, #10 Exhibit 4-7, #11 Exhibit 4-8, #12 Exhibit 4-9, #13 Exhibit 4-10, #14 Exhibit 4-11, #15 Exhibit 4-12, #16 Exhibit 4-13, #17 Exhibit 4-14, #18 Exhibit 4-15, #19 Exhibit 4-16, #20 Exhibit 4-17, #21 Exhibit 4-18, #22 Exhibit 4-19, #23 Exhibit 4-20, #24 Exhibit 4-21, #25 Exhibit 4-22, #26 Exhibit 4-23, #27 Exhibit 4-24, #28 Exhibit 4-25)(Davis, Paul)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14386818). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Latinos for Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - List of State Governors and Secretaries of State, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Cain Declaration 20210118, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Global Risk Analysis: Special Report, # 4 Exhibit 4-1, # 5 Exhibit 4-2, # 6 Exhibit 4-3, # 7 Exhibit 4-4, # 8 Exhibit 4-5, # 9 Exhibit 4-6, # 10 Exhibit 4-7, # 11 Exhibit 4-8, # 12 Exhibit 4-9, # 13 Exhibit 4-10, # 14 Exhibit 4-11, # 15 Exhibit 4-12, # 16 Exhibit 4-13, # 17 Exhibit 4-14, # 18 Exhibit 4-15, # 19 Exhibit 4-16, # 20 Exhibit 4-17, # 21 Exhibit 4-18, # 22 Exhibit 4-19, # 23 Exhibit 4-20, # 24 Exhibit 4-21, # 25 Exhibit 4-22, # 26 Exhibit 4-23, # 27 Exhibit 4-24, # 28 Exhibit 4-25)(Davis, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latinos for Trump v. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latinos for Trump
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Represented By: Kellye SoRelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Represented By: Kellye SoRelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.G.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Represented By: Kellye SoRelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Represented By: Kellye SoRelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Macias
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Represented By: Kellye SoRelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Represented By: Kellye SoRelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blacks for Trump
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Represented By: Kellye SoRelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Secretaries of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Members of the 117th U.S. Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Schumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All State Governors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?