AQTECH, Inc. v. LG Electronics, Inc.
Plaintiff: AQTECH, Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00095
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Effect Alternative Service on Defendant by AQTECH, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Shumaker, John)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 Documents received in Clerk's Office for Foreign Service. FedEx pickup confirmation included. (lad)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics, Inc.. (bw)
January 29, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AQTECH, Inc.. (Connor, Cabrach)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14431693). No Summons requested at this time, filed by AQTECH, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AQTECH, Inc. v. LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AQTECH, Inc.
Represented By: Cabrach J. Connor
Represented By: John M. Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?