Gesture Technology Partners, LLC v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gesture Technology Partners, LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00123
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney C. Matthew Rozier for Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fred I. Williams on behalf of C. Matthew Rozier ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14494562) by on behalf of Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1)
February 5, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics Inc.. (am)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (am)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Williams, Fred)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Williams, Fred)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against LG Electronics Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14454208), filed by Gesture Technology Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gesture Technology Partners, LLC v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gesture Technology Partners, LLC
Represented By: Fred I. Williams
Represented By: C. Matthew Rozier
Represented By: Michael Simons
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Represented By: Jonathan L. Hardt
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?