WSOU Investments, LLC v. NetGear, Inc.
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments, LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Defendant: NetGear, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00155
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California by NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Wu, #2 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amr 0. Aly for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Yusuf Esat for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lisa M. Schoedel for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cayman C. Mitchell for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 29, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Yusuf Esat ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14639035) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin)
March 29, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Amr O. Aly ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14638704) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexander J. Hadjis for NetGear, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R. Clonts on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. Attorney David R. Clonts added to party NetGear, Inc.(pty:dft) (Clonts, David)
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Lisa M. Schoedel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14628025) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell for Cayman Mitchell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14627836) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Cadwell on behalf of Alexander J. Hajdis ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14621465) by on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cadwell, Kevin)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin E. Cadwell on behalf of NetGear, Inc.. Attorney Kevin E. Cadwell added to party NetGear, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cadwell, Kevin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on behalf of NetGear, Inc. by WSOU Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WSOU Investments, LLC. NetGear, Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Siegmund, Mark)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NetGear, Inc.. (bw)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siegmund, Mark)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Siegmund, Mark)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Siegmund, Mark)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14501206), filed by WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Siegmund, Mark)
February 19, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WSOU Investments, LLC v. NetGear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetGear, Inc.
Represented By: Amr 0. Aly
Represented By: Yusuf Esat
Represented By: Lisa M. Schoedel
Represented By: David R. Clonts
Represented By: Alexander J. Hadjis
Represented By: Kevin E. Cadwell
Represented By: Cayman C. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSOU Investments, LLC doing business as Brazos Licensing and Development
Represented By: John W. Downing
Represented By: Mark D. Siegmund
Represented By: Heather S. Kim
Represented By: Jonathan K. Waldrop
Represented By: Jack Shaw
Represented By: Marcus A. Barber
Represented By: Darcy L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?