Streamscale, Inc. v. Cloudera, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Streamscale, Inc.
Defendant: Automatic Data Processing, Inc., Experian plc, Cloudera, Inc., Wargaming (Austin), Inc., ADP, Inc., Intel Corporation, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC, Experian Health, Inc. and CSIdentity Corp.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00198
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Filing 125 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Intel Corporation by Cloudera, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Document Subpoena, #2 Deposition Subpoena)(Faucette, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2022 Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cloudera, Inc. for proceedings held on 8/01/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter: FTR. (Weber, Brock)
August 1, 2022 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Streamscale, Inc. for proceedings held on 8/1/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter: FTR. (Williamson, Sarah)
August 1, 2022 Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland: Discovery Hearing held on 8/1/2022, counsel appeared both via Zoom and in person. Parties announced ready. Statements and arguments of counsel heard. Pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Proceedings (OGP) 4.1 - Patent Cases, the parties are to email a jointly proposed order to the Court'sLaw Clerk at Regan_Rundio@txwd.uscourts.gov within seven (7) days of the date of this hearing. Written Order to follow. Hearing concluded. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.)(sm3)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING #118 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey E. Faucette for Cloudera, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Setting Zoom Discovery for 8/1/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot3)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER of Limited Referral: the discovery dispute raised by the parties via email on Tuesday, July 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
July 26, 2022 Filing 118 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E. Faucette ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16304226) by Steven P. Tepera on behalf of Cloudera, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tepera, Steven) Modified on 7/26/2022 (lad).
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Discovery ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3)
June 6, 2022 Filing 116 Proposed Protective Order by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael)
June 4, 2022 Filing 115 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 6-2-22, Proceedings Transcribed: Discovery Hearing (Zoom). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 254-340-6114. (kd)
June 2, 2022 Filing 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 6/2/2022. Statements and Arguments of Counsel heard. Written Order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(sm3)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER, (Discovery Hearing set for 6/2/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot4)
May 20, 2022 Filing 112 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER to pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER CANCELLING Markman Hearing. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING, ( Markman Hearing set for 4/1/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright,). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tada)
March 11, 2022 Filing 106 NOTICE of Filing Joint Claim Construction Statement by Streamscale, Inc. (lad)
March 10, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda)
March 8, 2022 Filing 105 Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael) Modified on 3/9/2022 (lad).
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER, (Markman Hearing RESET for 4/1/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3)
March 3, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Intel Corporation (Gooch, Joseph)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (the "Motion") entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is MOOT in view of #103 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Intel Corporation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RRlc)
February 23, 2022 Filing 102 Redacted Public Version of #99 Sealed Document, by CSIdentity Corp., Cloudera, Inc., Experian Health, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC, Intel Corporation, Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (Nash, Brian)
February 22, 2022 Filing 101 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #93 Claim Construction Brief,, by CSIdentity Corp., Cloudera, Inc., Experian Health, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC, Intel Corporation, Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. John with Exhibits 18-19, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19)(John, Jennifer)
February 17, 2022 Filing 100 ATTACHMENT Declaration of Annaleigh Curtis in Support of Defendants' Reply ISO Motion for Intra-District Transfer with Exhibits 2-4 to #99 Sealed Document, by CSIdentity Corp., Cloudera, Inc., Experian Health, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC, Intel Corporation, Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Curtis Declaration, #2 Exhibit 3 to Curtis Declaration, #3 Exhibit 4 to Curtis Declaration)(Nash, Brian)
February 17, 2022 Filing 99 Sealed Document: Defendants' Reply in Support of Opposed Motion for Intra-District Transfer of Venue to the Austin Division of #89 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Austin Division by CSIdentity Corp., Cloudera, Inc., Experian Health, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC, Intel Corporation, Wargaming (Austin), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Curtis Declaration) (Nash, Brian)
February 8, 2022 Filing 98 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Karson Declaration in Support of StreamScale's Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 to Karson Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Karson Declaration)(Karson, Michael)
February 7, 2022 Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Shawn Williamson on behalf of Streamscale, Inc.. Attorney Sarah Shawn Williamson added to party Streamscale, Inc.(pty:pla) (Williamson, Sarah)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
February 1, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Deadline to File Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Intra District Transfer by Intel Corporation re #89 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Austin Division (Nash, Brian)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER CANCELLING DISCOVERY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
January 18, 2022 Filing 93 Opening Claim Construction Brief by CSIdentity Corp., Cloudera, Inc., Experian Health, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC, Intel Corporation, Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. John with Exhibits 1-17, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Nash, Brian)
January 11, 2022 Filing 92 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Streamscale, Inc., re #89 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Austin Division filed by Defendant Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC, Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Defendant Experian Health, Inc., Defendant Cloudera, Inc., Defendant CSIdentity Corp., Defendant Wargaming (Austin), Inc., Defendant Intel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bryan D. Richardson, #2 Affidavit of Michael D. Karson, #3 Exhibit 1 to Karson Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Karson Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Karson Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Karson Decl., #7 Exhibit 5 to Karson Decl., #8 Exhibit 6 to Karson Decl., #9 Exhibit 7 to Karson Decl., #10 Exhibit 8 to Karson Decl., #11 Exhibit 9 to Karson Decl., #12 Exhibit 10 to Karson Decl., #13 Exhibit 11 to Karson Decl.)(Karson, Michael)
December 20, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE of Extension of Briefing Deadlines by Streamscale, Inc. re #89 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Austin Division (Karson, Michael)
December 17, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Filing of Inter Partes Review by Streamscale, Inc. (Karson, Michael)
December 14, 2021 Filing 89 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Austin Division by CSIdentity Corp., Cloudera, Inc., Experian Health, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC, Intel Corporation, Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. John with Exhibits 1-13, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Stan Watt (Wargaming), #3 Affidavit Declaration of Sandra Beaver (Experian Marketing), #4 Affidavit Declaration of David Proctor (CSIdentity), #5 Affidavit Declaration of Jeannene Michel (Cloudera), #6 Affidavit Declaration of Maryam Damavandi (Experian Information), #7 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Knowlton (Experian Health), #8 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Herrgott (Intel), #9 Proposed Order)(Nash, Brian)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #54 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as MOOT in view of #87 Order Granting Agreed Motion to Substitute Parties entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #33 Motion to Dismiss as MOOT in view of #67 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RRlc)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #53 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as MOOT in view of #67 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT entered by Judge Alan D Albright.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RRlc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Christopher Kao added to party CSIdentity Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Kao added to party Experian Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Kao added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Kao added to party Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC(pty:dft) by CSIdentity Corp., Experian Health, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC.(Kao, Christopher)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #72 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as MOOT in view of #87 Order Granting Agreed Motion to Substitute Parties entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (RRlc)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING #86 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
October 14, 2021 Set Deadlines: CSIdentity Corp. answer due 10/29/2021; Experian Health, Inc. answer due 10/29/2021; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 10/29/2021; Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC answer due 10/29/2021. (jc5)
October 14, 2021 Filing 86 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Party Regarding Experian by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Karson, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
September 24, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE of Change of Address by Massimo Ciccarelli (Ciccarelli, Massimo)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 3/25/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2022. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 1/20/2023. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
August 30, 2021 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Intel Corporation, re #75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Intel Corporation (Nash, Brian)
August 27, 2021 Filing 81 STIPULATION (Joint) re: ECF No. 72 by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 80 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Streamscale, Inc., re #75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Intel Corporation (Karson, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 78 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 8-5-21, Proceedings Transcribed: Discovery Hearing (Zoom). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/8/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2021, (kd)
August 12, 2021 Filing 77 Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed Scheduling Order by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Massimo Ciccarelli on behalf of Streamscale, Inc.. Attorney Massimo Ciccarelli added to party Streamscale, Inc.(pty:pla) (Ciccarelli, Massimo)
August 9, 2021 Filing 75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nash, Brian)
August 9, 2021 Filing 74 ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by ADP, Inc..(Moffa, Matthew)
August 9, 2021 Filing 73 ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Wargaming (Austin), Inc..(Ayers, Jennifer)
August 9, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Experian PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Tepera, Steven)
August 9, 2021 Filing 71 ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cloudera, Inc..(Tepera, Steven)
August 5, 2021 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 8/5/2021. Case called for Discovery Hearing. At issue are pre-Markman discovery issues. The defendants are requesting that there is a per patent limitation and that the claim terms are narrowed due to the size of the case. The Court heard argument from both sides. There was also a request for the deadline for agreed scheduling order to be moved one week in order to include the Court's rulings. The Court agreed to the extension. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(ir)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING. Discovery Hearing via Zoom set for 8/5/2021 04:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
July 30, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William J. McCabe on behalf of ADP, Inc.. Attorney William J. McCabe added to party ADP, Inc.(pty:dft) (McCabe, William)
July 26, 2021 Filing 67 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADP, Inc., Cloudera, Inc., Experian PLC, Intel Corporation, Wargaming (Austin), Inc. amending #44 Amended Complaint,., filed by Streamscale, Inc..(lad)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #57 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court has reviewed the Motion and agrees that no party will be prejudiced by the proposed amendment. Accordingly, the Motion is GRANTED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #59 Motion for Discovery entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff may propound jurisdictional discovery requests consistent with the Court's Amended Standing Order Regarding Venue and Jurisdictional Discovery Limits for Patent Cases, dated June 8, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Motion is GRANTED. Ms. Haghighatian and Mr. Teng arewithdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff StreamScale, Inc. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #50 Motion to Substitute Party entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that ADP, Inc. is substituted as a party defendant in this action in place of Automatic Data Processing, Inc. All prior pleadings, motions, answers, and/or other filed documents in this case reflecting Automatic Data Processing, Inc. shall be deemed to say ADP, Inc. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
July 22, 2021 Filing 66 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian PLC. (Tepera, Steven)
July 21, 2021 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nadia E. Haghighatian and Austin C. Teng by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haghighatian, Nadia)
July 19, 2021 Filing 64 STIPULATION Joint by Experian PLC. (Tepera, Steven)
July 19, 2021 Filing 63 ATTACHMENT to #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Experian PLC. (Tepera, Steven)
July 16, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jamie H. McDole (McDole, Jamie)
July 16, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Address by Phillip B. Philbin (Philbin, Phillip)
July 16, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael D. Karson (Karson, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Discovery (Plaintiff StreamScale, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery) by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDole, Jamie)
July 13, 2021 Filing 58 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Streamscale, Inc., re #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Experian PLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jamie H. McDole, #2 Exhibit A - Cloudera_Experian press release, #3 Exhibit B - B Libenson LinkedIn profile, #4 Exhibit C - A Lintner profile, #5 Exhibit D - London Stock Exchange Page for EXPN, #6 Exhibit E - Experian homepage, #7 Exhibit F - 06-23-2021 Email between Kao and Karson, #8 Exhibit G - Experian search re US, #9 Exhibit H - Experian search re US 2021)(McDole, Jamie)
July 9, 2021 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redline of Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - 06-29-2021 ltr from T Gooch to J McDole)(McDole, Jamie)
July 9, 2021 Filing 56 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Streamscale, Inc., re #53 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Intel Corporation (Plaintiff StreamScale, Inc.'s Response to Defendant Intel Corporation's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (McDole, Jamie)
July 8, 2021 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT (Case Readiness Status Report) by Streamscale, Inc.. (McDole, Jamie)
June 29, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Experian PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tepera, Steven)
June 25, 2021 Filing 53 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
June 11, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cloudera, Inc..(Tepera, Steven)
June 11, 2021 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by ADP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moffa, Matthew)
June 11, 2021 Filing 49 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Wargaming (Austin), Inc..(Ayers, Jennifer)
June 11, 2021 Filing 48 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Matthew J Moffa added to party ADP, Inc.(pty:dft) by ADP, Inc..(Moffa, Matthew)
June 11, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Moffa on behalf of ADP, Inc. (Moffa, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and the new response date for Intel to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is June 25, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
June 10, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Cloudera, Inc. answer due 6/25/2021. (ir)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff StreamScale, Inc. to respond to Defendant Intel Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is extended to and including June 1, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
June 8, 2021 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #44 Amended Complaint, by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Brian)
May 28, 2021 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Streamscale, Inc., re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Intel Corporation (McDole, Jamie)
May 28, 2021 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants amending, filed by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(McDole, Jamie)
May 24, 2021 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDole, Jamie)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer J. John for Intel Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amanda L. Major for Intel Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher S. Ponder for Wargaming (Austin), Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph Taylor Gooch for Intel Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Harper Batts for Wargaming (Austin), Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Annaleigh E. Curtis for Intel Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Kao for Cloudera, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Vikram Iyer for Intel Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sonal N. Mehta for Intel Corporation. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brock S. Weber for Cloudera, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
May 11, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven P. Tepera Brock Weber ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14793337) by on behalf of Cloudera, Inc.. (Tepera, Steven)
May 11, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven P. Tepera Christopher Kao ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14793270) by on behalf of Cloudera, Inc.. (Tepera, Steven)
May 10, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Nash on behalf of Vikram Iyer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14788545) by on behalf of Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Nash on behalf of Sonal N. Mehta ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14788544) by on behalf of Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Nash on behalf of Joseph Taylor Gooch ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14788543) by on behalf of Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Nash on behalf of Jennifer J. John ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14788542) by on behalf of Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Nash on behalf of Annaleigh E. Curtis ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14788541) by on behalf of Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Christopher Nash on behalf of Amanda L. Major ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14788540) by on behalf of Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 34 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by Intel Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Austin Michael Schnell on behalf of Intel Corporation. Attorney Austin Michael Schnell added to party Intel Corporation(pty:dft) (Schnell, Austin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Nash on behalf of Intel Corporation. Attorney Brian Christopher Nash added to party Intel Corporation(pty:dft) (Nash, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Klein Ayers (on behalf of Harper Batts) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14787668) by on behalf of Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ayers, Jennifer)
May 10, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Klein Ayers (on behalf of Christopher Ponder) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14787595) by on behalf of Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ayers, Jennifer)
May 10, 2021 Filing 28 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (Ayers, Jennifer)
May 10, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Pltf's Complaint for Patent Infringement. Attorney Jennifer Klein Ayers added to party Wargaming (Austin), Inc.(pty:dft) by Wargaming (Austin), Inc..(Ayers, Jennifer)
May 10, 2021 Filing 26 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cloudera, Inc.. (Tepera, Steven)
May 10, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Steven P. Tepera added to party Cloudera, Inc.(pty:dft) by Cloudera, Inc..(Tepera, Steven)
May 10, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by ADP, Inc..(Villarreal, Jose)
April 20, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Streamscale, Inc. as to Experian PLC. Waiver sent on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Karson, Michael)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Cloudera, Inc. and Intel Corporation answer due 5/10/2021; Wargaming (Austin), Inc. answer due 5/10/2021. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for ADP to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 10, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
April 1, 2021 Reset Deadlines: ADP, Inc. answer due 5/10/2021. (bw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 21 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Automatic Data Processing, Inc.. (Villarreal, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by Automatic Data Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jose Carlos Villarreal on behalf of Automatic Data Processing, Inc.. Attorney Jose Carlos Villarreal added to party Automatic Data Processing, Inc.(pty:dft) (Villarreal, Jose)
March 24, 2021 Filing 18 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Defendants Cloudera, Inc., Intel Corporation, and Wargaming (Austin), Inc. by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDole, Jamie)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Defendants Cloudera, Inc. and Wargaming (Austin), Inc. by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDole, Jamie)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Streamscale, Inc.. Cloudera, Inc. served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (McDole, Jamie)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Streamscale, Inc.. Wargaming (Austin), Inc. served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (McDole, Jamie)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Streamscale, Inc.. Intel Corporation served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (McDole, Jamie)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Streamscale, Inc.. Automatic Data Processing, Inc. served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (McDole, Jamie)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D. Karson on behalf of Streamscale, Inc. (Karson, Michael)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Austin Teng on behalf of Streamscale, Inc. (Teng, Austin)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nadia Elena Haghighatian on behalf of Streamscale, Inc. (Haghighatian, Nadia)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Wargaming (Austin), Inc.. (lad)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip B. Philbin on behalf of Streamscale, Inc. (Philbin, Phillip)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Intel Corporation. (lad)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cloudera, Inc.. (lad)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Automatic Data Processing, Inc.. (lad)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Streamscale, Inc.. for Cloudera, Inc., Automatic Data Processing, Inc., Wargaming (Austin), Inc. and Intel Corporation (McDole, Jamie)
March 3, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (am)
March 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McDole, Jamie)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Streamscale, Inc.. (McDole, Jamie)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14546109). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US8683296, #2 Exhibit B - US9160374, #3 Exhibit C - US9385759, #4 Exhibit D - US10003358, #5 Exhibit E - Petition for Correction, #6 Exhibit F - US10291259, #7 Exhibit G - Petition for Correction, #8 Exhibit H - US10666296, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDole, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streamscale, Inc. v. Cloudera, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Data Processing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian plc
Represented By: Steven P. Tepera
Represented By: Brock S. Weber
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloudera, Inc.
Represented By: Brock S. Weber
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Represented By: Steven P. Tepera
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wargaming (Austin), Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Klein Ayers
Represented By: Christopher S. Ponder
Represented By: Harper Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADP, Inc.
Represented By: Jose Carlos Villarreal
Represented By: Matthew J Moffa
Represented By: William J. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Taylor Gooch
Represented By: Vikram Iyer
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Represented By: Jennifer J. John
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Annaleigh E. Curtis
Represented By: Amanda L. Major
Represented By: Austin Michael Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Marketing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Health, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSIdentity Corp.
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streamscale, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie H. McDole
Represented By: Nadia Elena Haghighatian
Represented By: Phillip B. Philbin
Represented By: Austin Teng
Represented By: Michael D. Karson
Represented By: Massimo Ciccarelli
Represented By: Sarah Shawn Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?