Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC and Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv00226
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company answer due 5/15/2021. (bw)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 15, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Gilliland, Derek)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Gilliland, Derek)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (lad)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Gilliland, Derek)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14568291). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Gilliland, Derek)
March 9, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
March 9, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Jonathan DeBlois
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?