Rock Creek Networks, LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Rock Creek Networks, LLC
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00290
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Waiver sent on 4/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Connor, Cabrach)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (lad)
March 25, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
March 24, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14626197). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX-750, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rock Creek Networks, LLC v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock Creek Networks, LLC
Represented By: Cabrach J. Connor
Represented By: John M. Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?