Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC and Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00596
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. answer due 8/20/2021. (ir)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. HPE's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to IV's Complaint (Dkt. 1) is extended until August 20, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas R. Fulford for Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
July 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek T. Gilliland on behalf of Thomas Fulford ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14980123) by on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, Derek)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Gilliland, Derek)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Gilliland, Derek)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. (ab4)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Gilliland, Derek)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Paul J. Hayes, Matthew Vella and Thomas Fulford. (lad)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/11/2021) (lad).
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14900002). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Gilliland, Derek)
June 11, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 11, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Jonathan DeBlois
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Thomas R. Fulford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Represented By: Jonathan DeBlois
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Thomas R. Fulford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?