ADT LLC et al v. Vivint, Inc.
Plaintiff: ADT LLC and The ADT Security Corporation
Defendant: Vivint, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00687
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Vivint, Inc.. (Tindel, Andy)
July 26, 2022 Filing 22 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1)
July 25, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tepera, Steven)
July 25, 2022 Filing 20 Pro Hac Vice Letter to ADT LLC and The ADT Security Corporation for attorney Ranjini Acharya. (zv)
July 25, 2022 Filing 19 Pro Hac Vice Letter to ADT LLC and The ADT Security Corporation for attorney Eric C. Rusnak. (zv)
July 25, 2022 Filing 18 Pro Hac Vice Letter to ADT LLC and The ADT Security Corporation for attorney Audrey Lo. (zv)
July 25, 2022 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Letter to ADT LLC and The ADT Security Corporation for attorney Michael E. Zeliger. (zv)
July 22, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED against Vivint, Inc. amending #15 Amended Complaint., filed by ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tepera, Steven)
July 21, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vivint, Inc. amending, filed by ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tepera, Steven)
July 21, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION JOINT by ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation. (Tepera, Steven)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Brian C. Nash is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. The Court directs the Clerk to remove Brian C. Nash from the Court's CM/ECF service list for this cause of action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Brian C. Nash by ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tepera, Steven)
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven P. Tepera on behalf of ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation. Attorney Steven P. Tepera added to party ADT LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Steven P. Tepera added to party The ADT Security Corporation(pty:pla) (Tepera, Steven)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
March 10, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
August 14, 2021 Case Stayed (ls)
August 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is stayed and administratively closed until the proceeding pending before the International Trade Commission, In re Certain Residential Premises Security Monitoring and Automation Control Panels, and Components Thereof, ITC Investigation No. 337-TA-3555, becomes final and is no longer subject to judicial review, including all appeals from the ITCs determination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy W. Tindel on behalf of Vivint, Inc. (Tindel, Andy)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vivint, Inc.. (Tindel, Andy)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659(a) by Vivint, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sterling A. Brennan ISO Vivint's Unopposed Motion to Stay Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659(a), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Granting Vivint's Unopposed Motion to Stay Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659(a))(Tindel, Andy)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation as to Vivint, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Nash, Brian)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vivint, Inc.. (lad)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nash, Brian)
July 1, 2021 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare a form AO120, FLATTEN, and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (lad)
July 1, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
June 30, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. These include the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare a form AO120, FLATTEN, and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (lad)
June 29, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation. (Nash, Brian)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation. as to Vivint, Inc. (Nash, Brian)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14965564), filed by ADT LLC, The ADT Security Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (US8976937), #2 Exhibit B (US9286772), #3 Exhibit C (937 Claim Chart - Smart Hub), #4 Exhibit D (937 Claim Chart - SkyControl), #5 Exhibit E (772 Claim Chart - Smart Hub), #6 Exhibit F (772 Claim Chart - SkyControl), #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patents)(Nash, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADT LLC et al v. Vivint, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint, Inc.
Represented By: Andy W. Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADT LLC
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Represented By: Steven P. Tepera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The ADT Security Corporation
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Represented By: Steven P. Tepera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?