The Trustees of Purdue University v. STMicroelectronics N.V. et al
Plaintiff: The Trustees of Purdue University
Defendant: STMICROELECTRONICS N.V.; ET AL., STMicroelectronics, Inc. and STMicroelectronics N.V.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00727
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by STMicroelectronics N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sostek, Bruce)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: STMicroelectronics N.V. answer due 10/11/2021. (mc5)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Trustees of Purdue University. STMicroelectronics N.V. served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Siegmund, Mark)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Trustees of Purdue University. STMicroelectronics N.V. served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Siegmund, Mark)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics N.V. (jc5)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics N.V. (jc5)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Trustees of Purdue University. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Siegmund, Mark)
August 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: STMicroelectronics, Inc. answer due 10/11/2021. (ls)
August 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for STMicroelectronics, Inc. to respond to The Trustees of Purdue Universitys Complaint for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand is extended up to and including October 11, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
August 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff may effect service on STMicroelectronics N.V. by serving its U.S. subsidiary, STMicroelectronics, Inc., and/or outside counsel, Bruce Sostek of Holland & Knight LLP. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Cohen on behalf of STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Cohen, Justin)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLAINTIFFS Motion for Leave to Effect Alternative Service by The Trustees of Purdue University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Halima Shukri Ndai, #2 Errata A, #3 Proposed Order)(Shore, Michael) Modified motion type on 8/9/2021 (lad).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard L. Wynne, Jr on behalf of STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Wynne, Richard)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce S. Sostek on behalf of STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Sostek, Bruce)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by STMicroelectronics N.V., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sostek, Bruce)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel E. Joyner on behalf of The Trustees of Purdue University. Attorney Samuel E. Joyner added to party The Trustees of Purdue University(pty:pla) (Joyner, Samuel)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Trustees of Purdue University. STMicroelectronics, Inc. served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Ndai, Halima)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siegmund, Mark)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics N.V.. (ir)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (ir)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco Division must prepare the attached form AO120, flatten the document and then e-file upon opening of the case using the event Notice of Filing Patent/Trademark Form. (ir)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ir)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Trustees of Purdue University. (Siegmund, Mark)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15012224), filed by The Trustees of Purdue University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegmund, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Trustees of Purdue University v. STMicroelectronics N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Trustees of Purdue University
Represented By: Mark D. Siegmund
Represented By: Alfonso Garcia Chan
Represented By: Halima Shukri Ndai
Represented By: Michael W. Shore
Represented By: Samuel E. Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMICROELECTRONICS N.V.; ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMicroelectronics, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Sostek
Represented By: Justin S. Cohen
Represented By: Nadia Elena Haghighatian
Represented By: Richard L. Wynne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMicroelectronics N.V.
Represented By: Bruce S. Sostek
Represented By: Justin S. Cohen
Represented By: Nadia Elena Haghighatian
Represented By: Richard L. Wynne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?