Weatherford v. GATX Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sean Weatherford
Defendant: GATX Corporation, Joe Budzisz, Cody Smith, Michael Deason and Chris Zeig
Case Number: 6:2021cv01330
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 13 ATTACHMENT Order to #11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Opposed Motion for Protective Order by Joe Budzisz, Michael Deason, GATX Corporation, Cody Smith, Chris Zeig. (Perry, Kristen)
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Opposed Motion for Protective Order. Pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Proceedings Dated 10/8/2021. The proposed Order shall omit the word Proposed from the title. Resubmit the proposed "Order" using the Attachment event and link to motion. (ir)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Opposed Motion for Protective Order by Joe Budzisz, Michael Deason, GATX Corporation, Cody Smith, Chris Zeig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Perry, Kristen)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Joe Budzisz, Michael Deason, GATX Corporation, Cody Smith, Chris Zeig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Perry, Kristen)
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Michael Deason, GATX Corporation, Cody Smith, Chris Zeig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Kristen)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (ir)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eglc)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick M. Flynn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15614960) by on behalf of Joe Budzisz.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Flynn, Patrick)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eglc)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eglc)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristen L. Perry for Brian Garrison ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15583584) by on behalf of Michael Deason, GATX Corporation, Cody Smith, Chris Zeig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Perry, Kristen)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristen L. Perry For James Strickland ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15583420) by on behalf of Michael Deason, GATX Corporation, Cody Smith, Chris Zeig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Perry, Kristen)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Joe Budzisz re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Patrick)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Joe Budzisz re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Defendant Budzisz' Original Answer, filed in State Court)(Flynn, Patrick) Modified on 12/27/2021 (lad).
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties of GATX Corporation by GATX Corporation. (Perry, Kristen)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chris Zeig, Cody Smith, Joe Budzisz, GATX Corporation, Michael Deason (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15556276), filed by Chris Zeig, Cody Smith, Joe Budzisz, GATX Corporation, Michael Deason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Perry, Kristen)
December 21, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv)
December 21, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherford v. GATX Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Weatherford
Represented By: Carlos Dantes Mejias, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATX Corporation
Represented By: Kristen L. Perry
Represented By: Brian R. Garrison
Represented By: James R. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Budzisz
Represented By: Patrick M. Flynn
Represented By: Sasha Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Smith
Represented By: Kristen L. Perry
Represented By: Brian R. Garrison
Represented By: James R. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Deason
Represented By: Kristen L. Perry
Represented By: Brian R. Garrison
Represented By: James R. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Zeig
Represented By: Kristen L. Perry
Represented By: Brian R. Garrison
Represented By: James R. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?