Immersion Corporation v. Meta Platforms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Immersion Corporation
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc. and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv00541
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in TXW District Austin Division as case number 1:23-cv-00623. (ad3)
May 30, 2023 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 5/30/2023 - PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY. STATEMENTS AND ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEARD. WRITTEN ORDER FORTHCOMING.(Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(ad3)
May 30, 2023 Filing 86 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2)
May 30, 2023 Filing 85 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2)
May 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Sealed Order DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. TRANSFER to the Austin Division Granted. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3)
May 23, 2023 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders: #Order Regarding Court Docket Management and #Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure. Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2)
May 17, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE for Agreed Extension of Time by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RESETTING Zoom Markman Hearing for 5/30/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER CANCELLING Markman Hearing Via Zoom. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot1)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Setting Zoom Markman Hearing for 5/11/2023 03:00 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot2)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER of Limited Referral: Markman hearing and Claim Construction Order are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3)
April 4, 2023 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2)
March 15, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE for Extension of Time by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
March 10, 2023 Filing 77 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 1-23-23, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 12546660904. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/31/2023, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2023, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2023, (kd)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RESETTING Zoom Markman Hearing for 4/24/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RESETTING Zoom Markman Hearing for 3/13/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexandra Leeper. Attorney added for Meta Platforms, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
February 7, 2023 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf Alexandra Leeper ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17056786) by on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Setting Zoom Markman Hearing for 3/6/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
January 26, 2023 Filing 71 Redacted Copy of #63 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Immersion Corporation by Immersion Corporation. (Szpajda, Stefan)
January 23, 2023 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2023 re #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY. STATEMENTS AND ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEARD. MOTION #20 TO TRANSFER VENUE TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. WRITTEN ORDER FORTHCOMING. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(zv)
January 23, 2023 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Immersion Corporation re #67 Claim Construction Brief (Szpajda, Stefan)
January 22, 2023 Filing 69 Sealed Document filed Immersions Sur-Reply to DefendantsMotion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit) (sm3) (Main Document 69 replaced on 1/23/2023) (sm3). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2023: #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit) (sm3). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2023: #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit) (sm3). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2023: #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Affidavit) (sm3).
January 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #63 Sealed Motion. Noting that the motion is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a sur-reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (EKlc)
January 21, 2023 Filing 67 Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by Immersion Corporation. (Szpajda, Stefan)
January 20, 2023 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Immersion Corporation (Corrected) re #63 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
January 19, 2023 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #63 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Immersion Corporation. The Certificate of Service states that service was accomplished via CM/ECF, however that is not possible with sealed documents. Though a Notice goes out to all attorneys, the document filed is not accessible. Please secure another means of service and file a corrected Certificate of Service linked to document #63. Thank you. (zv)
January 19, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Subsequent Factual Developments by Immersion Corporation re #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Szpajda, Stefan)
January 19, 2023 Filing 64 ATTACHMENT to #63 Sealed Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Immersion Corporation by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 185, #2 Exhibit 186, #3 Exhibit 187, #4 Proposed Order)(Szpajda, Stefan)
January 19, 2023 Filing 63 Sealed MOTION: Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer of #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. by Immersion Corporation, Sealed Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Immersion Corporation (Attachments: #1 Brief Proposed Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Transfer, #2 Affidavit Sur-Reply Dewberry Declaration, #3 Exhibit 118, #4 Exhibit 119, #5 Exhibit 120, #6 Exhibit 121, #7 Exhibit 122, #8 Exhibit 123, #9 Exhibit 124, #10 Exhibit 125, #11 Exhibit 126, #12 Exhibit 127, #13 Exhibit 128, #14 Exhibit 129, #15 Exhibit 130, #16 Exhibit 131, #17 Exhibit 132, #18 Exhibit 133, #19 Exhibit 134, #20 Exhibit 135, #21 Exhibit 136, #22 Exhibit 137, #23 Exhibit 138, #24 Exhibit 139, #25 Exhibit 140, #26 Exhibit 141, #27 Exhibit 142, #28 Exhibit 143, #29 Exhibit 144, #30 Exhibit 145, #31 Exhibit 146, #32 Exhibit 147, #33 Exhibit 148, #34 Exhibit 149, #35 Exhibit 150, #36 Exhibit 151, #37 Exhibit 152, #38 Exhibit 153, #39 Exhibit 154, #40 Exhibit 155, #41 Exhibit 156, #42 Exhibit 157, #43 Exhibit 158, #44 Exhibit 159, #45 Exhibit 160, #46 Exhibit 161, #47 Exhibit 162, #48 Exhibit 163, #49 Exhibit 164, #50 Exhibit 165, #51 Exhibit 166, #52 Exhibit 167, #53 Exhibit 168, #54 Exhibit 169, #55 Exhibit 170, #56 Exhibit 171, #57 Exhibit 172, #58 Exhibit 173, #59 Exhibit 174, #60 Exhibit 175, #61 Exhibit 176, #62 Exhibit 177, #63 Exhibit 178, #64 Exhibit 179, #65 Exhibit 180, #66 Exhibit 181, #67 Exhibit 182, #68 Exhibit 184) (Szpajda, Stefan) Modified on 1/20/2023 to correct event type to Sealed Motion and include Motion in docket text (zv).
January 19, 2023 Filing 62 BRIEF Immersion Corporation's Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Immersion Corporation. (Szpajda, Stefan)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Setting Motion Hearing for 1/23/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER VACATING LIMITED REFERRAL ORDER. The order referring the hearing and order on Defendant Meta Platform Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland, ECF No. 44 , is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER CANCELLING MOTIONS HEARING VIA IN PERSON AND ZOOM. MOTIONS HEARING VIA IN PERSON AND ZOOM, on January 23, 2023 at 01:30 PM is hereby CANCELLED until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv)
January 18, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra Fellowes on behalf of Immersion Corporation. Attorney Alexandra Fellowes added to party Immersion Corporation(pty:pla) (Fellowes, Alexandra)
January 18, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Crawford Maclain Wells on behalf of Immersion Corporation. Attorney Crawford Maclain Wells added to party Immersion Corporation(pty:pla) (Wells, Crawford)
January 5, 2023 Filing 56 BRIEF DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF regarding #33 Claim Construction Brief by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
December 30, 2022 Filing 55 Redacted Copy of #50 Sealed Document, by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
December 27, 2022 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. #51 Sealed Document, #50 Sealed Document, #52 Sealed Document, (Keefe, Heidi)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Came on for consideration is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Steven T. Skelley (Mr. Skelley) As Counsel. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that Mr. Skelley is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Skelley has withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff and that he no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (EKlc)
December 23, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #50 Sealed Document. The Certificate of Service states that service was accomplished via CM/ECF, however that is not possible with sealed documents. Though a Notice goes out to all attys, the document filed is not accessible. Please secure another means of service and file a corrected Certificate of Service linked to document #50. Thank you. (zv)
December 23, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #51 Sealed Document. The Certificate of Service states that service was accomplished via CM/ECF, however that is not possible with sealed documents. Though a Notice goes out to all attys, the document filed is not accessible. Please secure another means of service and file a corrected Certificate of Service linked to document #51. Thank you. (zv)
December 23, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #52 Sealed Document. The Certificate of Service states that service was accomplished via CM/ECF, however that is not possible with sealed documents. Though a Notice goes out to all attys, the document filed is not accessible. Please secure another means of service and file a corrected Certificate of Service linked to document #52. Thank you. (zv)
December 23, 2022 Filing 53 ATTACHMENT Exhibits 95-103 to the Declaration of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to #52 Sealed Document, by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 96, #2 Exhibit 97, #3 Exhibit 98, #4 Exhibit 99, #5 Exhibit 100, #6 Exhibit 101, #7 Exhibit 102, #8 Exhibit 103)(Keefe, Heidi)
December 23, 2022 Filing 52 Sealed Document: DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH L. STAMESHKIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA of #50 Sealed Document, by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 92, #2 Exhibit 93, #3 Exhibit 94, #4 Exhibit 104, #5 Exhibit 105) (Keefe, Heidi)
December 23, 2022 Filing 51 Sealed Document: DECLARATION OF MICHELLE P. WOODHOUSE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA of #50 Sealed Document, by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S1, #2 Exhibit S2, #3 Exhibit T, #4 Exhibit U, #5 Exhibit V, #6 Exhibit W, #7 Exhibit X) (Keefe, Heidi)
December 23, 2022 Filing 50 Sealed Document: DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA of #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
December 22, 2022 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Steven T. Skelley by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abraham, Joseph)
December 21, 2022 Filing 48 Opening Claim Construction Brief regarding #33 Claim Construction Brief by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Szpajda, Stefan)
December 21, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Request to Seal re #41 by Immersion Corporation (Abraham, Joseph) Modified on 12/21/2022 to link to document (zv).
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #45 Unopposed Motion For Leave to Amend Preliminary Contentions. Noting that the motion is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may supplement its infringement contentions to add Claim 15 of U.S. Patent No. 10,269,222 and Defendant may supplement its invalidity contentions to add Claim 15 of U.S. Patent No. 10,269,222. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (EKlc)
December 20, 2022 Filing 46 Redacted Copy of #34 Sealed Document:Immersion Corporation's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue of #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA , by Immersion Corporation. (Szpajda, Stefan)
December 20, 2022 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to Amend Preliminary Contentions by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abraham, Joseph)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE HEARING ORDER (ORDER of Limited Referral): referring the hearing and order on Defendant Meta Platform Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (ECF No. 20). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING MOTIONS HEARING VIA IN PERSON AND ZOOM. MOTIONS HEARING VIA IN PERSON AND ZOOM for purposes of limited referral set for 1/23/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv)
December 14, 2022 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Immersion Corporation re #40 Sealed Document,,, #36 Sealed Document, #34 Sealed Document, #37 Sealed Document (Szpajda, Stefan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 41 ATTACHMENT Exhibit 35 to #40 Sealed Document,,, by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 43, #2 Exhibit 44, #3 Exhibit 45, #4 Exhibit 46, #5 Exhibit 47, #6 Exhibit 48, #7 Exhibit 49, #8 Exhibit 50, #9 Exhibit 51, #10 Exhibit 52, #11 Exhibit 53, #12 Exhibit 54, #13 Exhibit 55, #14 Exhibit 56, #15 Exhibit 66, #16 Exhibit 67, #17 Exhibit 68, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 71, #21 Exhibit 91, #22 Exhibit 92, #23 Exhibit 93, #24 Exhibit 94, #25 Exhibit 95, #26 Exhibit 96, #27 Exhibit 97, #28 Exhibit 98, #29 Exhibit 101, #30 Exhibit 102, #31 Exhibit 104, #32 Exhibit 107, #33 Exhibit 108, #34 Exhibit 109, #35 Exhibit 110, #36 Exhibit 111, #37 Exhibit 112, #38 Exhibit 113, #39 Exhibit 114, #40 Exhibit 115, #41 Exhibit 116)(Szpajda, Stefan) Exh 31 sealed per atty request on 12/21/2022 (lad).
December 13, 2022 Filing 40 Sealed Document: Declaration of Timothy Dewberry in Support of #34 Sealed Document, by Immersion Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 57, #8 Exhibit 58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, #11 Exhibit 61, #12 Exhibit 62, #13 Exhibit 63, #14 Exhibit 64, #15 Exhibit 65, #16 Exhibit 72, #17 Exhibit 73, #18 Exhibit 74, #19 Exhibit 75, #20 Exhibit 76, #21 Exhibit 77, #22 Exhibit 78, #23 Exhibit 79, #24 Exhibit 80, #25 Exhibit 81, #26 Exhibit 82, #27 Exhibit 83, #28 Exhibit 84, #29 Exhibit 85, #30 Exhibit 86, #31 Exhibit 87, #32 Exhibit 88, #33 Exhibit 89, #34 Exhibit 90, #35 Exhibit 99, #36 Exhibit 100, #37 Exhibit 103, #38 Exhibit 105, #39 Exhibit 106, #40 Exhibit 117) (Szpajda, Stefan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #34 Sealed Document, Declaration of Yeshwant Muthusamy by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 32, #31 Exhibit 33, #32 Exhibit 34)(Szpajda, Stefan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #34 Sealed Document, Declaration of Francis Jose by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30, #2 Exhibit 31)(Szpajda, Stefan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 37 Sealed Document: Declaration in Support of #34 Sealed Document, by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 36 Sealed Document: Declaration in Support of #34 Sealed Document, by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 35 Proposed Order to #34 Sealed Document: Immersion Corporation's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue of #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Immersion Corporation. (Szpajda, Stefan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 34 Sealed Document: Immersion Corporation's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue of #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
November 30, 2022 Filing 33 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Phillip E. Morton, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Keefe, Heidi)
November 22, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Agreed Extensions by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emily E. Terrell. Attorney added for Meta Platforms, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
November 16, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Emily E. Terrell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16759928) by on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
October 26, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Agreed Extensions by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. Markman Hearing set for 2/6/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection set for 2/20/2024 09:00AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Trial set for 2/20/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv)
September 19, 2022 Filing 27 Redacted Copy of #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
September 16, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. #Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases. (bot4)
September 16, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Intent to Proceed with Venue Discovery by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
September 12, 2022 Filing 25 Sealed Document: Sealed Exhibits 47 and 48 to the Declaration of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin of #22 Affidavit in Support,,, by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48, #2 Proof of Service) (Keefe, Heidi)
September 12, 2022 Filing 24 ATTACHMENT Exhibits 61 to 91 to the Declaration of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to #22 Affidavit in Support,,, by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62, #2 Exhibit 63, #3 Exhibit 64, #4 Exhibit 65, #5 Exhibit 66, #6 Exhibit 67, #7 Exhibit 68, #8 Exhibit 69, #9 Exhibit 70, #10 Exhibit 71, #11 Exhibit 72, #12 Exhibit 73, #13 Exhibit 74, #14 Exhibit 75, #15 Exhibit 76, #16 Exhibit 77, #17 Exhibit 78, #18 Exhibit 79, #19 Exhibit 80, #20 Exhibit 81, #21 Exhibit 82, #22 Exhibit 83, #23 Exhibit 84, #24 Exhibit 85, #25 Exhibit 86, #26 Exhibit 87, #27 Exhibit 88, #28 Exhibit 89, #29 Exhibit 90, #30 Exhibit 91)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 12, 2022 Filing 23 ATTACHMENT Exhibits 36 to 60 to the Declaration of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin to #22 Affidavit in Support,,, by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 43, #8 Exhibit 44, #9 Exhibit 45, #10 Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit 47, #12 Exhibit 48, #13 Exhibit 49, #14 Exhibit 50, #15 Exhibit 51, #16 Exhibit 52, #17 Exhibit 53, #18 Exhibit 54, #19 Exhibit 55, #20 Exhibit 56, #21 Exhibit 57, #22 Exhibit 58, #23 Exhibit 59, #24 Exhibit 60)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 12, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. Declaration of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 12, 2022 Filing 21 Sealed Document: DECLARATION OF MICHELLE P. WOODHOUSE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA of #20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit C1, #6 Exhibit C2, #7 Exhibit D1, #8 Exhibit D2, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G1, #12 Exhibit G2, #13 Exhibit H1, #14 Exhibit H2, #15 Exhibit I1, #16 Exhibit I2, #17 Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit K, #19 Exhibit L, #20 Exhibit M1, #21 Exhibit M2, #22 Exhibit N1, #23 Exhibit N2, #24 Exhibit O, #25 Exhibit P, #26 Exhibit Q, #27 Exhibit R1, #28 Exhibit R2) (Keefe, Heidi)
September 12, 2022 Filing 20 Opposed Sealed Motion DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keefe, Heidi)
September 6, 2022 Filing 19 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Immersion Corporation for attorney C. Maclain Wells. (zv)
September 6, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Szpajda, Stefan)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Phillip E. Morton. Attorney added for Meta Platforms, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
August 11, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Phillip E. Morton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16388232) by on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth L. Stameshkin. Attorney added for Meta Platforms, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dena Chen. Attorney added for Meta Platforms, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
August 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Readiness Status Report by Immersion Corporation (Szpajda, Stefan)
August 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron)
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16349198) by on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 3, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi L. Keefe on behalf of Dena Chen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16349035) by on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 1, 2022 Filing 9 Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Meta Platforms, Inc..(Keefe, Heidi)
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
June 15, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Meta Platforms, Inc. answer due 8/1/2022. (zv)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immersion Corporation. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Szpajda, Stefan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc. (sv)
May 26, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv)
May 26, 2022 All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/
May 26, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Szpajda, Stefan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Immersion Corporation. (Szpajda, Stefan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Immersion Corporation. (Szpajda, Stefan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16079214), filed by Immersion Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Szpajda, Stefan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immersion Corporation v. Meta Platforms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Represented By: Dena Chen
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Phillip E. Morton
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Emily E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexandra Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Represented By: Dena Chen
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stameshkin
Represented By: Phillip E. Morton
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Emily E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexandra Leeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immersion Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Szpajda
Represented By: Cliff Win, Jr.
Represented By: Cristofer Leffler
Represented By: David D. Schumann
Represented By: Joseph M. Abraham
Represented By: Palani Pradeep Rathinasamy
Represented By: Sam Young Kim
Represented By: Steven T. Skelley
Represented By: Timothy Franklin Dewberry
Represented By: Crawford Maclain Wells
Represented By: Alexandra Fellowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?