Joseph Van Loon et al v. Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Van Loon, Tyler Almeida, Alexander Fisher, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale and Nate Welch
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury and Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control
Case Number: 6:2022cv00920
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Coogle on behalf of Department of the Treasury, Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury. Attorney Christine Coogle added to party Department of the Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Christine Coogle added to party Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft), Attorney Christine Coogle added to party Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft), Attorney Christine Coogle added to party Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury(pty:dft) (Coogle, Christine)
October 28, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Department of the Treasury, Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury, re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Austin Division of the Western District of Texas filed by Defendant Office of Foreign Assets Control, Defendant Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Defendant Department of the Treasury, Defendant Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury (Healy, Christopher)
October 21, 2022 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tyler Almeida, Alexander Fisher, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale, Nate Welch, re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Austin Division of the Western District of Texas filed by Defendant Office of Foreign Assets Control, Defendant Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Defendant Department of the Treasury, Defendant Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ainsworth, Charles)
October 14, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Austin Division of the Western District of Texas by Department of the Treasury, Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Healy, Christopher)
October 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher W. Healy on behalf of Department of the Treasury, Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury (Healy, Christopher)
October 13, 2022 Remark: Plaintiff's counsel was contacted by the Clerk's Office informing them that document #13 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service is filed incorrectly and will need to be refiled using the correct event entry of Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Executed to USA. (zv)
October 13, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service by Tyler Almeida, Alexander Fisher, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale, Nate Welch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kannon K. Shanmugam for Tyler Almeida,Kannon K. Shanmugam for Alexander Fisher,Kannon K. Shanmugam for Joseph Van Loon,Kannon K. Shanmugam for Preston Van Loon,Kannon K. Shanmugam for Kevin Vitale,Kannon K. Shanmugam for Nate Welch. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matteo Godi for Tyler Almeida,Matteo Godi for Alexander Fisher,Matteo Godi for Joseph Van Loon,Matteo Godi for Preston Van Loon,Matteo Godi for Kevin Vitale,Matteo Godi for Nate Welch. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian M. Lipshutz for Tyler Almeida,Brian M. Lipshutz for Alexander Fisher,Brian M. Lipshutz for Joseph Van Loon,Brian M. Lipshutz for Preston Van Loon,Brian M. Lipshutz for Kevin Vitale,Brian M. Lipshutz for Nate Welch. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer K. Corcoran for Alexander Fisher,Jennifer K. Corcoran for Joseph Van Loon,Jennifer K. Corcoran for Preston Van Loon,Jennifer K. Corcoran for Kevin Vitale,Jennifer K. Corcoran for Nate Welch. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv)
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT [Proposed Order] to #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles L. Ainsworth on behalf of Jennifer K. Corcoran ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16507197) by Tyler Almeida, Alexander Fisher, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale, Nate Welch. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles L. Ainsworth on behalf of Matteo Godi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16507258) by on behalf of Tyler Almeida, Alexander Fisher, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale, Nate Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to PHV, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles L. Ainsworth on behalf of Kannon K. Shanmugam ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16507225) by on behalf of Tyler Almeida, Alexander Fisher, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale, Nate Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to PHV, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles L. Ainsworth on behalf of Jennifer K. Corcoran ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16507197) by on behalf of Alexander Fisher, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale, Nate Welch.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 9, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles L. Ainsworth on behalf of Brian M. Lipshutz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16507131) by on behalf of Tyler Almeida, Alexander Fisher, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale, Nate Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to PHV, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sv)
September 8, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tyler Almeida, Alexander Fisher, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale, Nate Welch. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16497696), filed by Nate Welch, Alexander Fisher, Tyler Almeida, Joseph Van Loon, Preston Van Loon, Kevin Vitale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 8, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv)
September 8, 2022 All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Van Loon et al v. Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Van Loon
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Brian M. Lipshutz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Corcoran
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Matteo Godi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Almeida
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Brian M. Lipshutz
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Matteo Godi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Fisher
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Brian M. Lipshutz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Corcoran
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Matteo Godi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Van Loon
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Brian M. Lipshutz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Corcoran
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Matteo Godi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Vitale
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Brian M. Lipshutz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Corcoran
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Matteo Godi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Welch
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Brian M. Lipshutz
Represented By: Jennifer K. Corcoran
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: Matteo Godi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Christine Coogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Foreign Assets Control
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Christine Coogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Christine Coogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea M. Gacki, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Christine Coogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?