Liverman v. Office of the Probate Clerk of Upton County et al
Plaintiff: Roger Liverman
Defendant: Acting Judge Kathleen Stone, District Judge Pete "Pedro&quo Gomez, Jr., Probate Judge Bill Eyler, Office of the Probate Clerk of Upton County, Upton County, Texas, Katheryn Payne Hall, Albert Valadez, James McDonald, LaWanda McMurray, Probate Judge Vikki Bradley and District Judge Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr.
Case Number: 7:2018cv00141
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Midland Office
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 31 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr. re: #18 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File. (Graydon, Scot) Modified on 10/9/2018 to add document relationship link. (jk).
October 3, 2018 Filing 30 Opposition to Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Roger Liverman, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr. (jk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Unopposed to Defendant Judge Gomez's Opposed Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Out of Time by Roger Liverman re: #18 Motion for Leave to File. (jk)
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Judge Gomez's Response to #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Out of Time by Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Judge Gomez's Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Graydon, Scot) Modified on 9/21/2018 to add document relationship link. (jk).
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr. (Graydon, Scot)
September 20, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. James McDonald served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. Albert Valadez served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. Upton County, Texas served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. Kathleen Stone served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. Bill Eyler served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. Vikki Bradley served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. Katheryn Payne Hall served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. Office of the Probate Clerk of Upton County served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (jk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Liverman. LaWanda McMurray served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (jk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 16 PRO SE PLAINTIFFS PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION UNOPPOSED BY DEFENDANTS to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Roger Liverman. (se)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Roger Liverman, re #9 Opposed MOTION to Stay Scheduling Conference and Discovery filed by Defendant Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr. (se)
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #10 Answer to Complaint, by Roger Liverman. (se)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 Answer to Complaint by Roger Liverman. (se)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James McDonald.(jk)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Roger Liverman, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr. (jk)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Maegen E. Fox added to party Vikki Bradley(pty:dft), Attorney Maegen E. Fox added to party Bill Eyler(pty:dft), Attorney Maegen E. Fox added to party LaWanda McMurray(pty:dft), Attorney Maegen E. Fox added to party Office of the Probate Clerk of Upton County(pty:dft), Attorney Maegen E. Fox added to party Kathleen Stone(pty:dft), Attorney Maegen E. Fox added to party Upton County, Texas(pty:dft) by Vikki Bradley, Bill Eyler, LaWanda McMurray, Office of the Probate Clerk of Upton County, Kathleen Stone, Upton County, Texas.(Fox, Maegen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 Opposed MOTION to Stay Scheduling Conference and Discovery by Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Albert G. Valadez added to party Katheryn Payne Hall(pty:dft) by Katheryn Payne Hall.(Valadez, Albert)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 Defendant's Original ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Albert G. Valadez added to party Albert Valadez(pty:dft) by Albert Valadez.(Valadez, Albert)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vikki Bradley, Bill Eyler, Pete "Pedro&quo Gomez, Jr, Katheryn Payne Hall, James McDonald, LaWanda McMurray, Office of the Probate Clerk of Upton County, Kathleen Stone, Upton County, Texas, Albert Valadez. (jk)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEF regarding #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Roger Liverman. (jk)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Roger Liverman. (jk)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 BRIEF regarding #1 Complaint by Roger Liverman. (jk)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number M428943), filed by Roger Liverman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liverman v. Office of the Probate Clerk of Upton County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Judge Kathleen Stone
Represented By: Denis Dennis
Represented By: Maegen E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Judge Pete "Pedro&quo Gomez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probate Judge Bill Eyler
Represented By: Denis Dennis
Represented By: Maegen E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Probate Clerk of Upton County
Represented By: Denis Dennis
Represented By: Maegen E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upton County, Texas
Represented By: Denis Dennis
Represented By: Maegen E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katheryn Payne Hall
Represented By: Albert G. Valadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Valadez
Represented By: Albert G. Valadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaWanda McMurray
Represented By: Denis Dennis
Represented By: Maegen E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probate Judge Vikki Bradley
Represented By: Denis Dennis
Represented By: Maegen E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Judge Pete (Pedro) Gomez, Jr.
Represented By: Scot M. Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Liverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?