Saleh v. Dover Artificial Lift Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: Samir Saleh
Defendant: Dover Artificial Lift Systems, LLC
Case Number: 7:2018cv00192
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED Ashok Bail's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #3 filed 15, 2018, is GRANTED. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Bail has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.000, made payable to : Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashok Bail ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11462055) by on behalf of Samir Saleh. (Bail, Ashok)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter Regarding Non-Admitted Status As To Plaintiff's Attorney, Ashok Bail.(lw) Modified on 11/6/2018 (lw).
November 2, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF SAMIR SALEH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11415339). No Summons requested at this time, filed by SAMIR SALEH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bail, Ashok) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/2/2018) (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saleh v. Dover Artificial Lift Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Artificial Lift Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Saleh
Represented By: Ashok Bail
Represented By: Juliann H. Panagos
Represented By: Hessam Parzivand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?