United States of America v. Digby et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Greenwood Trust Co., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Terry L. Digby, Texas Bank, R. E. Janes Gravel, Co. and Security Business Capital, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00039
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Emily G. Stroope added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Stroope, Emily)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Michael T. Morgan added to party Security Business Capital, LLC(pty:dft) by Security Business Capital, LLC.(Morgan, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to R. E. Janes Gravel, Co. (lw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Greenwood Trust Co. (lw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Texas Bank. (lw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Security Business Capital, LLC. (lw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (lw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Terry L. Digby. (lw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (for R.E. Janes Gravel, Co.) (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/12/2019) (lw).
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (for Greenwood Trust, Co.) (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/12/2019) (lw).
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (for Texas Bank) (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/12/2019) (lw).
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (for Security Business Capital, LLC, f/k/a Venture Finance, Inc.) (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/12/2019) (lw).
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC) (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/12/2019) (lw).
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (for Terry L. Digby) (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/12/2019) (lw).
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yepuri, Moha)
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Digby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Emily G. Stroope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Digby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. E. Janes Gravel, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Business Capital, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Moha P. Yepuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?