Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company v. AES Drilling Fluids Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Philadelphia Indeminty Insurance Company and AES Drilling Fluids Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00112
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AES Drilling Fluids Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stratton, C.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Designation of Additional Counsel by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company (Pilat, William)
May 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines: AES Drilling Fluids Holdings, LLC answer due 6/19/2019. (se)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint, Doc. #4 filed May 29, 2019, is GRANTED. The Defendant shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Original Complaint no later than June 19, 2019. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by AES Drilling Fluids Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stratton, C.)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AES Drilling Fluids Holdings, LLC. (lw)
May 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lw)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. (Pilat, William)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original (Filing fee Received $ 400. Receipt #0542-12079697), filed by Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 True and Correct copy of Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Pilat, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company v. AES Drilling Fluids Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indeminty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AES Drilling Fluids Holdings, LLC
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William R. Pilat
Represented By: Andrew J. Mihalick
Represented By: Allison M. Hooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?