Servance v. Davis
Petitioner: Andrew Servance
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 7:2019cv00121
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT; Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andrew Servance; DENYING certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO ANSWER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Lorie Davis to answer by 9/16/2019. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER IFP OR FEE.. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #3 Order to Show Cause, by Andrew Servance. (dm2)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Servance (dm2)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Supplement to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Andrew Servance. (jk) Modified on 6/11/2019 to correct docket event type. (dm2).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER IFP OR FEE. Therefore, it is ordered that Plaintiff shall either file an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the $400.00 filing fee within twenty (20) days of the entry of this Order or this case shall be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the orders of this Court. Signed by Judge David Counts. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(jk)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER SERVANCE TO SHOW CAUSE: Petitioner is ORDERED to respond with twenty (20) days from the date of this order addressing his exhaustion issues. Failure to timely comply with this Court's Order will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice for want of prosecution. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b).. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Servance (lw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Andrew Servance. (lw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00 - Due), filed by Andrew Servance.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Servance v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Servance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?