Gilbert v. Nodolf et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Christopher Gilbert
Defendant: FNU Ward, FNU Holtz, The State of Texas, Midland Police Department, Roy Scott, FNU Chairez and Laura Nodolf
Case Number: 7:2019cv00130
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Reginald Christopher Gilbert.. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dm2)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #4 Order for More Definite Statement (dt)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge David Counts. (dt)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Statement due July 1, 2019. Signed by Judge David Counts. (dt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to Reginald Christopher Gilbert. (lw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald Christopher Gilbert.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (lw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Reginald Christopher Gilbert.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Nodolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Chairez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Nodolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Christopher Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?