Telliho v. Advanced Building Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Telliho
Defendant: Advanced Building Services, LLC and Herman A. Stuart, Jr.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00178
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Advanced Building Services, LLC answer due 10/7/2019; Herman A. Stuart, Jr. answer due 10/7/2019. (se)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants shall filed their Answer on or before October 7, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Advanced Building Services, LLC, Herman A. Stuart, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (James, Kindall)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Telliho. All Defendants. (Scalise, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Advanced Building Services, LLC, Herman A. Stuart, Jr. (dm2)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dm2)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michael Telliho. (Scalise, Charles)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Michael Telliho. (Scalise, Charles)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12370522), filed by Michael Telliho. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scalise, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telliho v. Advanced Building Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Telliho
Represented By: Charles L. Scalise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Building Services, LLC
Represented By: Alma Fern Shields
Represented By: Kindall C. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman A. Stuart, Jr.
Represented By: Alma Fern Shields
Represented By: Kindall C. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?