Gilstrap v. Republic Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Drexel Gilstrap
Defendant: Republic Logistics, LLC and Cody Cobb
Case Number: 7:2019cv00213
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2020 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection set for 1/4/2021 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, ADR Report Deadline due by 1/13/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2020, Discovery due by 5/4/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 2/12/2020, Motions due by 6/8/2020. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Recommendations (Agreed) by Drexel Gilstrap. (Borsellino, Joshua)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' Original ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Ben Petty added to party Cody Cobb(pty:dft), Attorney Ben Petty added to party Republic Logistics, LLC(pty:dft) by Cody Cobb, Republic Logistics, LLC.(Petty, Ben)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drexel Gilstrap. Cody Cobb served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019; Republic Logistics, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Borsellino, Joshua)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cody Cobb. (see)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Republic Logistics, LLC. (see)
September 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (se)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Drexel Gilstrap. (Borsellino, Joshua)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12553911), filed by Drexel Gilstrap. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FLSA Consent of Drexel Gilstrap, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borsellino, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilstrap v. Republic Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drexel Gilstrap
Represented By: Joshua C. Borsellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?