Gilbert v. Nodolf et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Christopher Gilbert
Defendant: FNU Holtz, The State of Texas, Ms. FNU Ward, Midland Police Department, FNU Chairez, Laura Nodolf and Roy Scott Esquire
Case Number: 7:2019cv00231
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Reginald Christopher Gilbert. (see)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY WITHDRAW by Reginald Christopher Gilbert. (see)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Reginald Christopher Gilbert, TDCJ #02261224. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Statement due 11/20/2019. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the Midland Division of the Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter mailed to Reginald Christopher Gilbert. (cj)
September 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (cj)
September 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald Christopher Gilbert.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (cj)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Reginald Christopher Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Nodolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. FNU Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Chairez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Nodolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Scott Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Christopher Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?