Gonzales et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Correctional Officer Ruben Gonzales, Wanda Gonzales and Ruben Gonzales
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00278
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection set for 11/30/2020 at 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Trial set for 11/30/2020 at 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, ADR Report Deadline due by 2/10/2020 , Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2020 , Discovery due by 5/12/2020 . Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Scheduling Recommendations Agreed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Anthony, Arthur)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days after the appearance of any defendant. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
November 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Anthony, Arthur)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Anthony, Arthur)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12901824), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit C-1- Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures, #5 Exhibit C-2 - Defendant's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Request for Disclosures, #6 Exhibit D - Midland County Central Appraisal District Valuation)(Anthony, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Arthur E. Anthony
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Correctional Officer Ruben Gonzales
Represented By: Robert C. Lane
Represented By: Joshua D. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Gonzales
Represented By: Robert C. Lane
Represented By: Joshua D. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Gonzales
Represented By: Robert C. Lane
Represented By: Joshua D. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?