Sanchez v. Griffis et al
Plaintiff: Cruz E. Sanchez
Defendant: Sgt. S. Seibolt, All Kitchen Workers, Cpl. I. Galvan, C.O. (FNU) Hendricks, A.D.O. Jessica Allen, Medical Director T.J. Powell, Master Sgt. T. Roach, Sgt. M. Cox, Captain Steven McNeil, Lieutenant (FNU) Durham, Lieutenant Jesse Abalos, Cpl. T. Warner, Chief Deputy (FNU) Mancha, C.O. (FNU) Bodwell, Mike Griffis and Jackie (LNU)
Case Number: 7:2020cv00208
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 53 Certified Mail Receipt of #28 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 52 Certified Mail Receipt of #25 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 51 Certified Mail Receipt of #27 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 50 Certified Mail Receipt of #37 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 49 Certified Mail Receipt of #29 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 48 Certified Mail Receipt of #31 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 47 Certified Mail Receipt of #36 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 46 Certified Mail Receipt of #30 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 45 Certified Mail Receipt of #32 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 44 Certified Mail Receipt of #24 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 43 Certified Mail Receipt of #38 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 42 Certified Mail Receipt of #26 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 41 Certified Mail Receipt of #34 Certified Mailing (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 40 Certified Mail Receipt of #33 Certified Mailing. (slt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 39 Certified Mail Receipt of #35 Certified Mailing. (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 38 Certified Mailing of #9 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 37 Certified Mailing of #10 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 36 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #11 Summons Issued, #5 Response, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 35 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #12 Summons Issued, #5 Response, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 34 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #13 Summons Issued, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 33 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #14 Summons Issued, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 32 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #15 Summons Issued, #5 Response, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 31 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #16 Summons Issued, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 30 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #8 Order, #17 Summons Issued (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 29 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #18 Summons Issued, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 28 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #19 Summons Issued, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 27 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #8 Order, #20 Summons Issued. (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 26 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #5 Response, #21 Summons Issued, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 25 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #22 Summons Issued, #5 Response, #8 Order (slt)
October 6, 2020 Filing 24 Certified Mailing of #1 Complaint, #23 Summons Issued, #5 Response, #8 Order (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Jackie (LNU). (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Jessica Allen. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to T.J. Powell. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to (FNU) Bodwell. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to (FNU) Hendricks. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to I. Galvan. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to T. Warner. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to S. Seibolt. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to M. Cox. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to T. Roach. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Jesse Abalos. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to (FNU) Durham. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Steven McNeil. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to (FNU) Mancha. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Mike Griffis. (slt)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Cruz E. Sanchez. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #3 Order by Cruz E. Sanchez. (slt)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cruz E. Sanchez. (slt)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER IFP or Fee. Signed by Judge David Counts. (Attachments: #1 App for IFP)(slt)
August 26, 2020 Case assigned CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Cruz E. Sanchez.(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Griffis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. S. Seibolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Kitchen Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. I. Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. (FNU) Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.D.O. Jessica Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director T.J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Sgt. T. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Steven McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant (FNU) Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Jesse Abalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. T. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Deputy (FNU) Mancha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. (FNU) Bodwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Griffis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie (LNU)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruz E. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?