Jordan v. Criner et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Jordan, III
Defendant: Brodney J. Moses, Sheriff David Criner and Laura Nodolf
Case Number: 7:2020cv00210
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. 1983 AGAINST THE ABOVE-ENTITLED DEFENDANT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Laura Nodolf terminated. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. 1983 AGAINST DEFENDANT MOSES FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Brodney J. Moses terminated.Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Certified Mailing of #8 Order, #7 Response to Order for More Definite Statement, #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Issued to Sheriff David Criner. (ja)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to David Criner. (ja)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #4 Order for More Definite Statement by Harvey Jordan, III. (ja)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING DOC. #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply up to and including October 30, 2020, entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order for More Definite Statement by Harvey Jordan, III.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (ja)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Harvey Jordan III, #213743. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Statement due September 30, 2020. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter as to Harvey Jordan, III. (se)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harvey Jordan, III. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (se)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.00-DUE), filed by Harvey Jordan, III.(se)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Criner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brodney J. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff David Criner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Nodolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Jordan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?